Dirk Askew, et al v. United States
Original Case: 4:12-cv-00152
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:14-cv-01205 |
Type | civil / united states as a party |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 04, 2015 10:12 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Dirk Askew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Beulah Askew
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 26 2015
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Kermit E. Bye, Steven M. Colloton and Raymond W. Gruender AUTHORING JUDGE:Steven M. Colloton (PUBLISHED) [4278223] [14-1205] |
Docket last updated: 09/04/2015 10:12 AM CDT |
Tuesday, January 28, 2014 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4118050] 14-1205 (PSA) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of memorandum opinion and judgment filed 11/18/13, notice of appeal, docket entries, [4118057] 14-1205 (PSA) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/10/2014. Appendix due 03/20/2014. BRIEF APPELLANT, United States of America due 03/20/2014 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4118059] 14-1205 (PSA) |
||
APPEARANCE filed by Mark W. Pennak for Appellant United States of America w/service 01/28/2014 [4118107] 14-1205 (MWP) |