1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1). (Attachment: #1 Affidavit) (zdr) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by the Government as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ORAL MOTION for Temporary Detention (3-Day Hold) by the Government as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing by KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Initial Appearance as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 1/3/2018. Oral Motion to Unseal Case by the Government as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1); heard and granted. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel by KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1); heard and granted. Oral Motion for Temporary Detention (3-Day Hold) by the Government as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1); heard and granted. Consular Notification given by the Government. Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing by KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1); heard and granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 1/10/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Medical/Mental Health Alert issued to the D.C. Department of Corrections Medical Unit. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Held without Bond/ Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [3:06:12 - 3:17:58]; Defense Attorney: Tony Miles; US Attorney: David Gorman and Peter Lallas; Pretrial Officer: Saul Atencio. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case unsealed pursuant to Oral Motion by the government on 1/3/18 as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (ztl) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/3/2018 as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and for Speedy Trial Waiver by KENIEL AEON THOMAS and the Government. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Hearing as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 1/10/2018. Case called for Preliminary/Detention Hearing, but was not held. Joint Oral Motion by the Government and Defense to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and for Speedy Trial Waiver, excluding time from 1/10/2018 to 2/9/2018 (30 days), in the Interest of Justice, X-T as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1); heard and granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 2/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Commited with his consent/ Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [2:19:16 - 2:25:21]; Defense Attorney: Mary Petras; US Attorney: David Gorman; Pretrial Officer: Saul Atencio. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Manning Petras appearing for KENIEL AEON THOMAS (Petras, Mary) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS: Time excluded from 1/10/2018 until 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/10/2018. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing/Detention Hearing, JOINT ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial Waiver by KENIEL AEON THOMAS and USA. (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: Status Conference as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 2/9/2018. Case called for Preliminary/Detention Hearing but not held. Parties continue to discuss a plea agreement. Joint Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and Joint Oral Motion for Speedy Trial Waiver excluding time from 02/09/18-03/02/18 (20) twenty days in the interest of justice X-T as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1) heard and granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 3/2/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR-Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 7 [10:59:43-11:14:38]; Defense Attorney: Mary Petras; US Attorney: David Gorman; (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
JOINT ORAL MOTIONS by KENIEL AEON THOMAS and the Government to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and for Speedy Trial Waiver, excluding time from 3/2/2018 to 3/16/2018. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: Status Hearing as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 3/2/2018. Joint Oral Motions by the Government and KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1) to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and for Speedy Trial Waiver, excluding time from 3/2/2018 to 3/16/2018, in the Interest of Justice, XT; heard and granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 3/16/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendand Committed/ Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 7 [11:07:27 - 11:11:32]; Defense Attorney: Mary Petras; US Attorney: David Gorman; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing, JOINT ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial Waiver by KENIEL AEON THOMAS and USA. (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: Status Hearing as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 3/16/2018. Case called for Preliminary/Detention Hearing but not held. Parties continue to discuss a plea agreement. Joint Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and Joint Oral Motion for Speedy Trial Waiver excluding time from 3/16/18-3/30/18 in the interest of justice X-T as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1) heard and granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 3/30/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR-Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 6 [2:13:31-2:17:38]; Defense Attorney: Mary Petras; US Attorney: David Gorman; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman; (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ORAL MOTION by Defendant KENIEL AEON THOMAS to Continue the Preliminary/Detention Hearing to 4/13/18 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson, and to Exclude Time Until 4/13/18 Under the Speedy Trial Act, in the interest of justice. (kk) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for Status Hearing as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 3/30/18 : Case called for Preliminary/Detention Hearing, but not held. The defendant would like to retain counsel at this time. Oral Motion by Defendant to Continue the Preliminary/Detention Hearing to 4/13/18 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson, and to Exclude Time Until 4/13/18 Under the Speedy Trial Act in the interest of justice, heard and granted. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant committed/commitment issued. Court Reporter: FTR Gold - Ctrm. 7; FTR Time Frame: 1:53:30 - 1:58:11. Defense Attorney: Mary Petras; U.S. Attorney: David Gorman; Pretrial Officer: Saul Atencio. (kk) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and for Speedy Trial Waiver by KENIEL AEON THOMAS and the Government. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Hearing as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 4/13/2018. Defendant will retain an attorney. Joint Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and for Speedy Trial Waiver, excluding time from 4/13/2018 to 5/2/2018, in the Interest of Justice, XT, by KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1) and the Government; heard and granted. Defendant requests to be housed at Correctional Treatment Facility (CTF). The Court Orders Defendant's request to be reflected on the Commitment. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 5/2/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/ Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [2:05:49 - 2:16:28]; Defense Attorney: Mary Petras; US Attorney: David Gorman; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS: Time excluded from 4/13/2018 until 5/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 4/13/2018. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing, JOINT ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial Waiver by USA as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Status Conference as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 5/2/2018. Case called for Preliminary/Detention Hearing but not held. Defendant to retain Counsel. Joint Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and Joint Oral Motion for Speedy Trial Waiver excluding time from 05/07/18 - 05/11/18 (10) Ten days as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1) heard and granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 5/11/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR-Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 6 [2:31:26-2:38:16]; Defense Attorney: Mary Petras; US Attorney: David Gorman; (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS Time excluded from 05/02/18 until 05/11/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 05/02/18. (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Franz Carlyle Jobson appearing for KENIEL AEON THOMAS (Jobson, Franz) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing, JOINT ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial Waiver by KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (ldc) Modified on 5/11/2018 (ldc). [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Status Conference as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS held on 5/11/2018. Case called for Preliminary/Detention Hearing but not held. Parties continue to discuss a plea agreement. Joint Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and Joint Oral Motion for Speedy Trial Waiver excluding time from 05/11/18-07/13/18 (63) Sixty Three days in the interest of justice X-T as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1) heard and granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 7/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR-Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 6 [2:27:10-2:30:59]; Defense Attorney: Franz Jobson-Retained; US Attorney: David Gorman; Pretrial Officer: Tammy Everitt; (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS Time excluded from 05/11/18 until 07/13/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 05/11/18. (ldc) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kathryn Leigh Rakoczy appearing for USA. (Rakoczy, Kathryn) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by USA as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS.(Rakoczy, Kathryn) Modified Event on 7/2/2018 (js). [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
|
|
MINUTE ORDER: This court has reviewed the "Government's Unopposed Motion to Continue Detention Hearing"10 . Counsel for the government states that "Defendant... has been advised of his rights under the Speedy Trial Act... and... consents to this continuance request." Motion at 1. However, said motion is DENIED for the following two reasons: (1) The matter is on the calendar for a consolidated preliminary hearing and detention hearing, see 05/11/2018 Minute Entry; however, counsel for the government, in its motion, makes no reference to the scheduled preliminary hearing, and thus fails to indicate the extent to which -- if at all -- Defendant waives his rights under Rule 5.1 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. (2) Counsel for the government omits any reference to Defendant's right under the Bail Reform Act to a detention hearing in the time provided by Section 3142(f)(2) of Title 18, and the extent to which -- if at all -- Defendant waives such right. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 07/02/2018. (lcdar3) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
RENEWED Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention and Preliminary Hearings Related [+] by USA as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS.(Rakoczy, Kathryn) Modified Event on 7/3/2018 (js). [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-] newed
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
12
|
|
12
ORDER granting11 Motion to Continue and for Speedy Trial Waiver in the Interest of Justice - XT, excluding time from 7/13/2018 to 8/2/2018 as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1): Preliminary/ Detention Hearing continued to 8/2/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 7/3/2018. (cal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
Consent MOTION to Continue Prelim/Detention Hrg by USA as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS.(Gorman, David) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
|
|
MINUTE ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue and for Speedy Trial Waiver in the Interest of Justice - XT, excluding time from 8/2/2018 to 9/14/2018 as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1): Consolidated Preliminary/ Detention Hearing continued to 1:45 p.m. on Friday September 14, 2018 in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 08/01/2018. (lcdar3) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing by USA as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS. (Gorman, David) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
ORDER granting14 Unopposed Motion by USA to Continue the Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS; continuing the 9/14/18 Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing to 10/5/18 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson in Courtroom 4; excluding the time from 9/14/18 through 10/5/18 for the purposes of any computation under the Speedy Trial Act, in the interest of justice; signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 9/13/18. (kk) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary & Detention Hearings by USA as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS.(Rakoczy, Kathryn) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
17
|
|
17
ORDER granting16 Motion to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing and for Speedy Trial Waiver, excluding time from 10/5/2018 to 11/15/2018 (41 Days), in the Interest of Justice, XT as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1). Preliminary/Detention Hearing continued to 11/15/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 10/4/2018. (zcal) [1:14-mj-00460-DAR]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
INFORMATION as to KENIEL AEON THOMAS (1) count(s) 1. (ad)
Related: [-]
|