UNIVERSA INVESTMENTS L.P. v. BORODICH et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-24286 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2019 6:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Alexander Borodich
|
|
Defendant
Universa Corporation Ltd.
|
|
Plaintiff
Universa Investments L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Form AO 120/121
Wed 02/27 9:09 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ls) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction | ||
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 02/26 5:20 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Universa Investments L.P. against Universa Corporation Ltd., Alexander Borodich Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (isc) |
|
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 02/26 5:18 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Universa Investments L.P. against Universa Corporation Ltd., Alexander Borodich. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (isc) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Mon 02/25 3:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re16 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court and Memorandum by N.S. Kathirithamby filed by Universa Investments L.P.. (de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
17 | 17
4
pgs
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Mon 02/25 3:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re16 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court and Memorandum by Joseph V. Mauch filed by Universa Investments L.P..(de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 02/25 3:02 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court and Memorandum by Universa Investments L.P..(de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction | ||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 02/11 11:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation on or before February 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/11/2019. (isc) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/17 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Universa Investments L.P. re13 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default (de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM
Mon 01/14 3:44 PM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Alexander Borodich, Alexander Borodich, Universa Corporation Ltd. - Motions Terminated:12 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/14/2019. (ls) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 01/11 5:27 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Alexander Borodich, Universa Corporation Ltd. by Universa Investments L.P..(de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Declaration | ||
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad
Wed 12/12 4:47 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad by Universa Investments L.P.. Universa Corporation Ltd. served on 11/23/2018, answer due 12/14/2018.(de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B", | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad
Wed 12/12 4:42 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad by Universa Investments L.P.. Alexander Borodich served on 11/23/2018, answer due 12/14/2018.(de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B", | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" | ||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/26 9:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Joseph V. Mauch is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff Universa Investments L.P., for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Mauch at JMauch@sflaw.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/26/2018. (isc) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/25 4:43 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph V. Mauch. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11107883 by Universa Investments L.P.. Responses due by 11/8/2018(de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/25 4:19 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Universa Investments L.P. (de Alejo, Alexandra) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Notice of Court Practice
Thu 10/18 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/18/2018. (isc) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued for Service Abroad
Thu 10/18 8:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Universa Corporation Ltd. (ls) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued for Service Abroad
Thu 10/18 8:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Alexander Borodich. (ls) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Form AO 120/121
Thu 10/18 8:25 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ls) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 10/18 8:14 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ls) |
|
1 | 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT against ALEXANDER BORODICH, UNIVERSA CORPORATION LTD. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11083420, payment transferred from : 18-cv-24286 UNIVERSA INVESTMENTS L.P vs. BORODICH, et al., filed by UNIVERSA INVESTMENTS L.P..(de Alejo, Alexandra) Modified text on 10/18/2018 (jua). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |