IPTV-B-C14, LLC v. McConaghy et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael L Brown |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-04852 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2019 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lawrence S. Gates
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric L. McConaghy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IPTV-B-C14, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 01/18 1:55 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Plaintiff's23 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice due to apparent lack of diversity jurisdiction. The Court DISMISSES this case without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/18/2019. (bgt) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 01/18 2:25 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) |
||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Wed 01/16 5:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by IPTV-B-C14, LLC. (Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 12/17 7:16 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed for a period of 30 days pending Plaintiff's continued investigation of the citizenship of investors in one of its upstream LLC members. All deadlines in this case are stayed, including but not limited deadlines for submission of a Joint Planning Report and Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/17/18. (jpa) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 12/11 3:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Eric L. McConaghy. (Beloin, Frederic) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stay
Wed 12/05 5:40 PM
MOTION to Stay and First Amendment to Revision to Certification of Limited Liability Company Membership with Brief In Support by IPTV-B-C14, LLC.(Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 12/05 3:56 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31, 2018, January 8, 9, 11, 28, 2019, February 5, 11, 13, 25, 2019, March 5, 11, 13, 25, 2019, April 2, 8, 10, 29, 2019, May 7, 13, 15, 28, 2019, by Frederic S. Beloin. (Beloin, Frederic) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 12/05 2:49 PM
RESPONSE re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by IPTV-B-C14, LLC. (Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
13
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/30 12:14 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 11/27 8:01 PM
RESPONSE re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by IPTV-B-C14, LLC. (Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/26 2:38 PM
ORDER: Upon review of the10 Notice of Filing, the Court finds that it has subject-matter jurisdiction over this action based on diversity. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/18. (jpa) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Wed 11/21 11:59 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Lawrence S. Gates. (Beloin, Frederic) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 11/21 11:53 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Lawrence S. Gates.(Beloin, Frederic) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Mtn to Dismiss and for Spoliation Sanctions, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Wed 11/21 5:04 PM
Clerks Notation approving14 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. (bgt) |
||
Saturday, November 17, 2018 | ||
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Sat 11/17 11:19 AM
Clerks Notation approving11 /12 Certificates of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statements. (bgt) |
||
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 11/16 4:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by IPTV-B-C14, LLC. (Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 11/16 12:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Eric L. McConaghy. (Beloin, Frederic) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 11/16 9:57 AM
Submission of6 Order,10 Notice of Filing, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpa) |
||
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 11/15 6:09 PM
NOTICE Of Filing by IPTV-B-C14, LLC re6 Order, Set Submission Deadline Plaintiff's Certification of Limited Liability Company Membership (Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 11/13 3:01 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Eric L. McConaghy.(Beloin, Frederic) |
|
Att: 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Spoliation Sanctions, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 11/09 1:57 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Service on Defendant Lawrence S. Gates by IPTV-B-C14, LLC (Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Return of Service Executed
Thu 11/01 4:06 PM
Return of Service Executed by IPTV-B-C14, LLC. Eric L. McConaghy served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Pendergrast, Craig) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline
Thu 11/01 1:15 PM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a notice with the Court, on or before 11/15/18, that properly lists the citizenship of each member of all LLC parties. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/1/18. (jpa) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
15
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/23 8:27 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/22/18. (jpa) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 10/22 5:29 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-04852-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/22/2018. (tcc) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 10/19 5:15 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Lawrence S. Gates. (tcc) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 10/19 5:15 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Eric L. McConaghy. (tcc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/19 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT filed by IPTV-B-C14, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8219194)(tcc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |