Hamre v. Sprout et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy E Brasel |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-02958 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2019 4:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wayne Ebbinger
|
|
Defendant
Officer Fildes
|
|
Defendant
Officer Lopez
|
|
Defendant
Robert Matheson
|
|
Defendant
Moorhead Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Moorhead, City of
|
|
Defendant
Officer Ryan Nelson
|
|
Defendant
Officer Sprout
|
|
Plaintiff
John Phillip Hamre
36370 460th St. SW
Nielsville, MN 56568 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Fargo Forum
Terminated: 10/18/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Tue 05/14 4:36 PM
JUDGMENT. cc: Hamre with 1983 with Appeal Packet(KNK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 05/10 4:27 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for23 (Written Opinion). The Report and Recommendation23 is ACCEPTED. The matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's "Motion for Complaint Package"21 is DENIED AS MOOT. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/10/2019. (KMW) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 02/20 2:26 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re21 MOTION Complaint Package filed by John Phillip Hamre,6 Complaint filed by John Phillip Hamre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/20/2019. (JRG) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Exhibit (Motions and Related Filings)
Fri 12/21 3:39 PM
EXHIBIT re21 MOTION Complaint Package filed by John Phillip Hamre.(AKL) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/21 3:38 PM
MOTION for Complaint Package filed by John Phillip Hamre.(AKL) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 10/19 9:05 AM
Case transferred in from District of North Dakota; Case Number 3:18-cv-00138. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per Sixth Division Civil Rights List. cc: Hamre. (kt) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re6 Complaint filed by John Phillip Hamre. (AS) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Case transferred to District of Minnesota. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal directing the Clerk to amend the docket. (AS) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/17/2018 to correct spelling) (lh). [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Phillip Hamre(as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Phillip Hamre(js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 SUPPLEMENT to document:6 Complaint by John Phillip Hamre.(js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
14 | 14 Letter from John Phillip Hamre re Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons. (NOTE: signed copies of notices received by clerk's office and added to docket entry3 ) (js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 Letter from John Phillip Hamre. (js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding unsigned Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons. (js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Unsigned Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons | ||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Phillip Hamre re10 Consent/Reassignment Form. (js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
10 | 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by John Phillip Hamre.(js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to Kandiyohi County Jail re8 Order (lh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
8 | 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and7 Supplement (Certificate of Inmate of Account and Assets) filed by John Phillip Hamre. (AS) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 SUPPLEMENT (Certificate of Inmate of Account and Assets) to document:1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Phillip Hamre.(as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 COMPLAINT against Officer Fildes, Officer Lopez, Robert Matheson, Moorhead, City of, Ryan Nelson, Officer Sprout (Filing fee: IFP) filed by John Phillip Hamre.(lf) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
5 | 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal conditionally granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (MB) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to John Phillip Hamre. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/20/2018. (js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT PACKET.(js) (js). [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope | ||
Att: 4 (8/7/2018) Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons | ||
2 | 2 SUPPLEMENT to document:1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Phillip Hamre. (js) Modified on 7/6/2018 to correct file date. (js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] | |
1 | 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Phillip Hamre. (js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/19/2018.] |