Thunderhawk et al v. Morton, County of, North Dakota et al
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel M Traynor |
Referred: | Clare R Hochhalter |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00212 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2019 3:33 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Tigerswan LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jose Zhagnay
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Waste'Win Young
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Cissy Thunderhawk
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Reverend John Floberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Governor Doug Burgum
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tigerswan LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morton, County of, North Dakota
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Grant Levi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheriff Kyle Kirchmeier
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Superintendent Michael Gerhardt, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 to 100
|
|
Defendant
Former Governor Jack Dalrymple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cissy Thunderhawk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Waste'Win Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reverend John Floberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Zhagnay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Wed 04/17 8:38 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:171 RESPONSE to Motion. Multiple relief document filed and Clerk's Office removed exhibit language from docket text. Clerk's Office filed MOTION to Amend/Correct and MOTION for Reconsideration at 172 . (sc) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
171 | 171
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 04/16 8:58 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re169 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Cross-Motion to Reconsider and For Leave to Amend filed by John Floberg, Cissy Thunderhawk, Waste'Win Young, Jose Zhagnay.(Smith-Drelich, Noah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint | ||
motion
Amend/Correct Reconsideration
Wed 04/17 8:36 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct44 Amended Complaint and MOTION for Reconsideration of88 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by John Floberg, Cissy Thunderhawk, Waste'Win Young, and Jose Zhagnay. See Document171 . (sc) |