WASHINGTON v. JOHNSON AND JOHNSON et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-15155 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2019 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
IMERYS TAC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC")
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON AND JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC")
|
Represented By
|
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
OLA WASHINGTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Suggestion of Death
Mon 02/26 12:17 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record by OLA WASHINGTON. (Barnes, Betsy) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 02/22 11:38 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (mb, ) |
||
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/15 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TAC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC") (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/01 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/01 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/31 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/31 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (TERSIGNI, JULIE) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/22 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") (LOCKE, THOMAS) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/22 10:00 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TAC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC"). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, ) |
|
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 10/22 8:53 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 10/22 9:45 AM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kas, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Mon 10/22 9:58 AM
Member Case Direct File on 10/20/2018, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (kas, ) |
||
Saturday, October 20, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 10/20 5:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9110057) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OLA WASHINGTON.(ROOT, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |