DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK et al v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gene Ek Pratter |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-04508 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment |
Case Filed: | Oct 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2019 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GREGORY G. NADEUA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LESLIE RICHARDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAYA VAN ROSSUM
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/24 12:08 PM
ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/20/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) |
|
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Mon 08/24 12:06 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO.17 ) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NOS.12 AND15 ) ARE GRANTED AND PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES, INCLUDING STATISTICS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/20/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) |
|
37 | 37
80
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Mon 08/24 12:04 PM
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/20/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Praecipe/Request
Tue 12/17 2:37 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, MAYA VAN ROSSUM. (YEAGER, JORDAN) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Praecipe/Request
Tue 12/17 2:29 PM
Entry of Appearance by DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, MAYA VAN ROSSUM. (FREED, MARK) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 11/22 3:05 PM
RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Brief filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LESLIE RICHARDS. (GARDNER, KENDA JO) |
|
33 | 33
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 11/22 2:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Support of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, MAYA VAN ROSSUM. (YEAGER, JORDAN) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 11/22 8:21 AM
RESPONSE in Support re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental filed by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, GREGORY G. NADEUA. (BERNSTEIN, RICHARD) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Transcript - RESTRICTED
Mon 11/18 4:34 PM
Transcript of SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HEARING held on 11/1/2019, before Judge GENE E.K, PRATTER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KATHLEEN FELDMAN. (amas) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 10/30 8:46 AM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING Hearing on Motion12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,15 MOTION for Summary Judgment : ORAL ARGUMENT IS NOW SET FOR 11/1/2019 AT 3:00 PM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, ) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 10/28 10:31 AM
|
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 09/30 2:50 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING Hearing on Motions12 MOTION for Summary Judgment , and15 MOTION for Summary Judgment : ORAL ARGUMENT IS NOW SET FOR 10/31/2019 AT 3:30 PM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Mon 09/30 2:52 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/31/2019 AT 3:30 PM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (sfl, ) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/15 11:44 AM
ORDERED THAT THE DEADLINES FOR THE EXHANGE OF TRIAL EXHIBITS AND THE SUBMISSION OF PRETRIAL MEMORANDA, THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND THE TRIAL POOL DATE, AS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (DOCKET NO. 10) SHALL BE CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/12/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 06/27 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,15 MOTION for Summary Judgment . ORAL ARGUMENT IS SET FOR 10/4/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 06/27 10:22 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/4/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 10/8/2019. (sfl, ) |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 06/26 10:47 AM
RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LESLIE RICHARDS. (GARDNER, KENDA JO) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 06/24 12:05 PM
RESPONSE in Support re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION. (BERNSTEIN, RICHARD) |
|
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 06/24 10:52 AM
ORDER granting21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE; granting22 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE. THE FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, AND LESLIE S. RICHARDS MAY FILE THEIR REPLY BRIEFS ON OR BEFORE JUNE 28, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/21/19.6/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/24 10:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,15 MOTION for Summary Judgment . REPLIES DUE BY 6/28/2019. (rab, ) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/21 8:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LESLIE RICHARDS.Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief.(GARDNER, KENDA JO) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/21 8:52 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION.Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service.(BERNSTEIN, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Reply Brief in Support of Motion of Defendant Federal Highway Administration for Summary Judgment | ||
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Mon 06/10 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by AARON STEMPLEWICZ on behalf of DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, MAYA VAN ROSSUM(STEMPLEWICZ, AARON) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/03 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN B. YEAGER on behalf of DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, MAYA VAN ROSSUM with Certificate of Service(YEAGER, JORDAN) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 05/30 4:19 PM
ORDER granting16 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/29/2019.5/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/30 3:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, MAYA VAN ROSSUM. (STEMPLEWICZ, AARON) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 05/29 1:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplement the Record and Proposed Order filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LESLIE RICHARDS.Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record and Proposed Order.(GARDNER, KENDA JO) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 04/18 11:58 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Facts, Brief.(GARDNER, KENDA JO) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/18 11:13 AM
ORDER GRANTING THE PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE13 . THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY MAY 31, 2019. APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE A REPLY TO THE RESPONSE SHALL BE SOUGHT NO LATER THAN 6/21/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/17/2019.4/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/16 2:40 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, MAYA VAN ROSSUM.Motion and Declaration.(STEMPLEWICZ, AARON) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 04/16 7:51 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION.Statement of Facts, Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(BERNSTEIN, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 03/22 10:26 AM
Administrative Record Notice of Filing of Administrative Record . (GARDNER, KENDA JO) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/25 4:01 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS WILL FILE AN INDEX TO THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ELECTRONICALLY AND WILL SEND A CD/DVD OR FLASH DRIVE, CONTAINING THE ENTIRE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, TO THE COURT AND COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFFS ON OR BEFORE 3/22/2019. THE DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 4/19/2019. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 4/19/2019. PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA SHALL BE FILED BY 6/21/2019. DEFENDANTS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA SHALL BE FILED BY 6/28/2019. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/8/2019, AT 3:00 PM, IN CHAMBERS. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL LIST ON 7/16/2019. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/22/2019. 2/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Mon 02/25 4:01 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: TRIAL POOL SET FOR 7/16/2019. (amas) |
||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing
Tue 01/22 10:53 AM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, 1/29/2019 AT 3:00 PM IS CANNCELLED.(sl, ) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/03 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD M. BERNSTEIN on behalf of FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, GREGORY G. NADEUA with Certificate of Service(BERNSTEIN, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/21 2:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 3/29/2019. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 4/12/2019. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA NO LATER THAN 6/21/2019. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA NO LATER THAN 6/28/2019. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/8/2019, AT 3:00 PM, IN CHAMBERS. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL LIST ON 7/9/2019. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/21/2018. 12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
6 | 6
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 12/21 1:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/20/2018. 12/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/14 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KENDA JO M. GARDNER on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LESLIE RICHARDS with Certificate of Service(GARDNER, KENDA JO) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
Fri 10/26 1:33 PM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas ) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 10/24 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/29/2019 AT 03:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sme, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement | ||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 10/24 3:52 PM
2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded 1 COPY TO THE US ATTY AND 1 TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 10/24/2018 (amas) |
||
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Mon 10/22 1:18 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK.(ahf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/22 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT against FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, GREGORY G. NADEUA, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LESLIE RICHARDS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186588.), filed by THE DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER, DELAWARE RIVERKEEPER NETWORK, MAYA VAN ROSSUM.(ahf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheets, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/22 1:18 PM
Summons Issued as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, FHWA, GREGORY G. NADEUA, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, LESLIE RICHARDS. 4 Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/22/2018 (ahf) |