Rube P. Hoffman Co v. Zara USA, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-09114 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2019 1:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Zara USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rube P. Hoffman Co.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Tue 09/10 2:14 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (iv) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation | ||
37 | 37
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Tue 09/10 2:13 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (iv) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation | ||
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 09/09 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Rube P. Hoffman Co.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Erikson, David) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Mon 07/29 4:45 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Text Only Scheduling Notice, 32 , Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction,30 filed by Defendants Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A., Zara USA, Inc.. (Gilbert, Jacob) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/26 4:08 PM
ORDER33 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 10/28/2019 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 4 Days) set for 11/12/2019 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
stip
Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 07/25 9:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to September 23, 2019, Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File pre-trial documents filed by defendants Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A., Zara USA, Inc..(Gilbert, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 07/16 10:52 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction30 is continued to August 12, 2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/15 11:58 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [NOTICE OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIA DE DISENO TEXTIL, S.A. a/k/a INDITEX, S.A.'S MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION] 30 filed by Plaintiff Rube P. Hoffman Co..(Patterson, S) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of David Erikson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D | ||
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 07/12 5:23 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [NOTICE OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIA DE DISENO TEXTIL, S.A. a/k/a INDITEX, S.A.'S MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION] filed by defendant Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Gilbert, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Wed 07/10 6:17 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction,28 filed by defendant Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.. (Gilbert, Jacob) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 07/08 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [NOTICE OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIA DE DISENO TEXTIL, S.A. a/k/a INDITEX, S.A.'S MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION] filed by defendant Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Anderson, Allan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/01 4:53 PM
ORDER26 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Initial Expert Disclosures must be exchanged by the Parties by July 26, 2019; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures must be exchanged by August 12, 2019; and Expert Discovery must be completed by August 28, 2019. (iv) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
stip
Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
Fri 06/28 6:05 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to August 28, 2019 filed by defendants Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A., Zara USA, Inc..(Gilbert, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Protective Order
Wed 02/13 1:32 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. re Stipulation for Protective Order24 . (See Order for Further Details) (kl) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Protective Order
Tue 02/12 7:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendants Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A., Zara USA, Inc..(Anderson, Allan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 01/30 9:32 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer to discuss and agree upon the scope and length of minimal jurisdictional discovery. The parties shall then inform the Courtroom Deputy Clerk of the terms of their agreement, or any failure to reach an agreement, by no later than Friday, February 8, 2019. (iv) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 01/29 11:17 AM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 4/1/2019. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 6/28/2019. Last Day to Hear Motions 8/5/2019. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 9/30/2019. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine 10/21/2019 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 4 Days) 11/12/2019 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
21 | 21
minutes
Motion Hearing Scheduling Conference - optional html form
Tue 01/29 11:07 AM
MINUTES OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION13 ; AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. The Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets dates. Please see separate Order Re Jury Trial, also filed today. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 01/18 11:47 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2019 is ADVANCED TO 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 01/14 10:12 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 13 filed by Defendant Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.. (Anderson, Allan) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 01/14 6:58 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Rube P. Hoffman Co... (Waller, Antoinette) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 01/07 10:58 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 13 in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Rube P. Hoffman Co.. (Patterson, S) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 01/07 10:55 PM
Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 13 filed by Plaintiff Rube P. Hoffman Co..(Patterson, S) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Antoinette Waller, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-17 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 01/07 6:02 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Antoinette S Waller counsel for Plaintiff Rube P. Hoffman Co.. Adding Antoinette Waller as counsel of record for Rube P. Hoffman Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Rube P. Hoffman Co.. (Attorney Antoinette S Waller added to party Rube P. Hoffman Co.(pty:pla))(Waller, Antoinette) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 12/06 3:30 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 1/28/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 12/03 6:58 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendant Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Anderson, Allan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 12/03 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A., Zara USA, Inc., identifying Industria de Diseno Textil, S.A.. (Anderson, Allan) |
|
11 | 11
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 12/03 6:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Zara USA, Inc..(Anderson, Allan) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 11/26 10:50 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A. answer now due 12/3/2018; Zara USA, Inc. answer now due 12/3/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendants Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.; Zara USA, Inc..(Attorney Allan E Anderson added to party Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Allan E Anderson added to party Zara USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Anderson, Allan) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 10/24 12:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Industria De Diseno Textil, S.A., Zara USA, Inc. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 10/24 12:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 10/24 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 10/23 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff RUBE P. HOFFMAN CO., (Erikson, David) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Tue 10/23 3:59 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by RUBE P. HOFFMAN CO.. (Erikson, David) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Tue 10/23 3:58 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by RUBE P. HOFFMAN CO.. (Erikson, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 10/23 3:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff RUBE P. HOFFMAN CO.. (Erikson, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 10/23 3:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff RUBE P. HOFFMAN CO.. (Erikson, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 10/23 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22628098 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff RUBE P. HOFFMAN CO.. (Attorney David A Erikson added to party RUBE P. HOFFMAN CO.(pty:pla))(Erikson, David) |