Davis v. Crow et al (INMATE 1)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | Gray M Borden |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00905 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2018 |
Defendant
John Crow
|
|
Defendant
Steven T. Marshall
|
|
Interested Party
Staff Attorneys
|
|
Plaintiff
Glennie Dee Davis
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 11/30 11:05 AM
JUDGMENT, in accordance with the memorandum opinion entered this date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: (1) the 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (2) the 1 petition for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed because the required permission has not been obtained from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals; further ORDERING that costs are taxed against petitioner, for which execution may issue; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/30/18.(djy, ) |
|
Att: 1 civil appeals checklist | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Fri 11/30 11:01 AM
OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/30/18. (djy, ) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 11/29 12:05 PM
No objections filed to4 report and recommendation (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, ) |
||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 11/02 2:45 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) The 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition for habeas corpus relief filed by Glennie Dee Davis on October 16, 2018 be DENIED; (2) This cause of action be DISMISSED in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3)(A) as Davis has failed to obtain the requisite order from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals authorizing this court to consider a successive habeas application ; Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/2/18. (djy, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Wed 10/24 11:17 AM
ORDER ON MOTION granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/24/18. (djy, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit
Wed 10/24 10:12 AM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Glennie Dee Davis. (beh, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 10/24 10:04 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Glennie Dee Davis.(beh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Memorandum |