Rice v. National Beverage Corporation d/b/a LaCroix Sparkling Waters
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Martha M Pacold |
Referred: | Beth W Jantz |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-07151 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, 2018-CH-12302 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2019 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
National Beverage Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lenora Rice
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 11 2019
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/11/2019. Mailed notice(mjc, ) |
1. | LaCroix's Sales Bubble Pops; Stock Tumbles (wsj.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/08/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 02/19/2020 4:58 AM CST |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) | ||
1 | 1 11 pgs NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-CH-12302) filed by National Beverage Corporation d/b/a LaCroix Sparkling Waters Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15106538.(Moore, Desiree) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Moore, Desiree) | |
3 | 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Beverage Corporation d/b/a LaCroix Sparkling Waters by Desiree F. Moore (Moore, Desiree) | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Beverage Corporation d/b/a LaCroix Sparkling Waters by Matthew Allen Alvis (Alvis, Matthew) |