Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00226
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2018
Last checked: Friday Oct 26, 2018 3:36 AM EDT
defendant
Ning Xi (1)
Represented By
Peter R. Zeidenberg
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Coburn
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
contact info
Ronald S. Safer
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
contact info
Charles E. Chamberlain, Jr.
Willey & Chamberlain LLP
contact info
Laura E. Zell
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Hagen W. Frank
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/26/2018 5:00 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ning Xi; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (ns). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Criminal Complaint
3 3 MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (ns). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
4 4 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Criminal Complaint1 as to Ning Xi (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (ns). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
CASE UNSEALED as to Ning Xi pursuant to defendant's arrest (ns) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Charles E. Chamberlain, Jr for defendant Ning Xi [Attorney Charles E. Chamberlain, Jr added to party Ning Xi(pty:dft)] (Chamberlain, Charles) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
WARRANT EXECUTED; defendant Ning Xi arrested by FBI agent Bruce Fowler in Okemos, MI (USM Control Room, mac) Modified date on 2/16/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SCHEDULING PROGRESSION OF CASE as to defendant Ning Xi: preliminary hearing and detention hearing set for 2/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTES of FIRST APPEARANCE of defendant Ning Xi held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; CASE UNSEALED; defendant appeared with retained counsel; government moved for detention and defendant remanded to custody of USM pending further proceedings before the magistrate judge (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
7 7 [DISREGARD] WAIVER of preliminary hearing by defendant Ning Xi (Frank, Hagen) Modified text on 2/23/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
8 8 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Ning Xi [Access to this document is available to the Court and temporarily available to attorney(s) for USA, Ning Xi only] (USPO Koon, Matthew)/jae)) Modified to revoke attorney access on 2/21/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTES of PRELIMINARY hearing and DETENTION hearing as to defendant Ning Xi held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; defendant waived preliminary hearing and ordered bound over for further proceedings before the grand jury; detention hearing adjourned; defendant remanded to custody pending detention hearing before the magistrate judge (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of preliminary hearing by defendant Ning Xi (sjc) Modified text on 2/23/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER that defendant Ning Xi is bound over for further proceedings before the Grand Jury; arraignment and initial pretrial conference if indicted, or status conference, set for 3/16/2018 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTES of DETENTION hearing as to defendant Ning Xi held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; government withdrew its motion for detention; defendant released on bond pending further proceedings before the grand jury (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
13 13 BOND and ORDER setting conditions of release as to defendant Ning Xi on a $1,000,000.00 secured appearance bond (copy provided to defendant); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter R. Zeidenberg for defendant Ning Xi [Attorney Peter R. Zeidenberg added to party Ning Xi(pty:dft)] (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
14 14 MOTION for extension of time to indict Defendant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information by Ning Xi (Chamberlain, Charles) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs MEMORANDUM in support by Ning Xi re MOTION for extension of time to indict Defendant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information 14 (Chamberlain, Charles) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
16 16 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCrimR 12.4 by Ning Xi re MOTION for extension of time to indict Defendant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information 14 (Chamberlain, Charles) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
17 17 [DISREGARD] ORDER as to defendant Ning Xi granting14 MOTION for extension of time to indict Defendant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information filed by Ning Xi; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) Modified text on 3/2/2018 (sjc). [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
18 18 PROPOSED ORDER re14 by Ning Xi (Chamberlain, Charles) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
19 19 ORDER granting motion for extension of time to indict Defendant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information filed by Ning Xi; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
20 20 NOTICE rescheduling hearing as to Ning Xi that was previously set for 3/16/18 at 10:00 AM; arraignment and initial pretrial conference if indicted, or status conference, set for 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura E. Zell for defendant Ning Xi [Attorney Laura E. Zell added to party Ning Xi(pty:dft)] (Zell, Laura) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
21 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Further Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information by Ning Xi (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 2 pgs MEMORANDUM in support by Ning Xi re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Further Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information 21 (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
23 23 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCrimR 12.4 by Ning Xi re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Further Extend Time for Filing of Indictment or Information 21 (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
24 24 ORDER granting motion for extension of time to indict21 as to Ning Xi; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
25 25 NOTICE rescheduling hearing as to Ning Xi that was previously set for 5/22/18 @10:00 AM; arraignment and initial pretrial conference if indicted, or status conference, set for 7/17/2018 at 10:30 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
26 26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict by Ning Xi (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 2 pgs MEMORANDUM in support by Ning Xi re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict 26 (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
28 28 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCrimR 12.4 by Ning Xi re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict 26 (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
29 29 ORDER granting motion for extension of time to indict26 as to Ning Xi; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
30 30 NOTICE rescheduling hearing as to Ning Xi that was previously set for 7/17/18 @10:30 AM; arraignment and initial pretrial conference, or status conference if indicted, set for 9/25/2018 at 10:30 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
31 31 UNOPPOSED MOTION to modify conditions of release by Ning Xi (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
32 32 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCrimR 12.4 by Ning Xi re UNOPPOSED MOTION to modify conditions of release 31 (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
33 33 ORDER granting motion to modify conditions of release31 as to Ning Xi (1); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
34 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict by Ning Xi (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
35 35 3 pgs MEMORANDUM in support by Ning Xi re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict 34 (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
36 36 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCrimR 12.4 by Ning Xi re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to indict 34 (Zeidenberg, Peter) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
37 37 ORDER granting motion for extension of time to indict34 as to Ning Xi; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
38 38 NOTICE rescheduling hearing as to Ning Xi that was previously set for 9/25/18 at 10:30 AM; arraignment and initial pretrial conference if indicted, or status conference, set for 11/1/2018 at 10:30 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (sjc) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
39 39 NOTICE rescheduling hearing as to Ning Xi that was previously set for 11/1/2018 at 10:30 AM; arraignment and initial pretrial conference and/or status conference rescheduled to 11/5/2018 at 10:30 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) [1:18-mj-00028-RSK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
40 40 INDICTMENT as to Ning Xi (ems)
Related: [-]