Pruitt v. Asphalt Zipper, Inc
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Referred: | Jeffrey C Manske |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-00324 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2019 4:56 AM CDT |
Defendant
Asphalt Zipper, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chuck Pruitt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
159 | 159
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Thu 08/11 2:41 PM
Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming the judgment of the District Court re154 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Asphalt Zipper, Inc. Bill of Costs included: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant-appellant pay to plaintiff-appellee the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court. (lad) |