Chavez v. Rudes et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-09933 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2019 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jane Does 1-9
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-9
|
|
Defendant
Scott M. Rudes
|
|
Plaintiff
Juan P. Chavez
1355 New York Ave.
Washington, DC 20002 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
misc
Received Returned Mail
Wed 10/07 1:17 PM
Received returned mail re:10 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Mail was addressed to Juan P. Chavez, 1355 New York Ave., Washington, DC 20002 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return To Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable To Forward. (vn) |
||
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Thu 04/30 1:44 PM
Mailed a copy of10 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, to Juan P. Chavez, 1355 New York Ave., Washington, DC 20002. (sac) |
||
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 04/29 10:32 AM
ORDER denying9 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 9) is denied. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/28/2020) (sac) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 01/14 7:39 AM
EMERGENT MOTION FOR REOPEN/RELIEF, for Reconsideration of re:5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint). Document filed by Juan P. Chavez.(sc) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 08/29 10:22 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to6 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan P. Chavez USCA Case Number 19-0015 Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and to transfer his brief to the District of Columbia Circuit. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it "lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Neitzke v. Williams , 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 8/29/2019. (tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Thu 08/29 10:22 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:8 USCA Mandate. (tp) |
||
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
misc
Received Returned Mail
Wed 05/15 11:35 AM
Received returned mail re:4 Order of Dismissal,5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint). Mail was addressed to Juan P. Chavez 1355 New York Ave. Washington, DC 20002 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender Attempted Not Known Unable to Forward. (vba) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Remark
Mon 03/25 2:34 PM
PRO SE IFP BRIEF. Document filed by Juan P. Chavez. (sc) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 01/02 12:35 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:6 Notice of Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Wed 01/02 12:35 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for6 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan P. Chavez were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 01/02 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from4 Order of Dismissal,5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint). Document filed by Juan P. Chavez. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) |
|
Att: 1 Motion for IFP | ||
appeal
Appeal Fee Due
Wed 01/02 12:33 PM
Appeal Fee Due: for6 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 1/4/2019. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Remark
Wed 01/02 12:34 PM
Appeal Remark as to6 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan P. Chavez. IFP DENIED 11/30/2018. (tp) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Mon 12/03 1:53 PM
Mailed a copy of4 Order of Dismissal,5 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), and Notice of Right to Appeal to Juan P. Chavez 1355 New York Ave. Washington, DC 20002. (vba) Modified on 12/3/2018 (vba) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)
Mon 12/03 9:24 AM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued November 30, 2018, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice to Chavez v. Rudes, No. 18-CV-2781 (EK) (N.D. Tex.. filed Oct. 18, 2018). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/30/2018)(mro) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Package | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 12/03 9:22 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1) for the limited purpose of dismissing this complaint without prejudice. Plaintiffs complaint is dismissed as duplicative. Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (ECF No. 3) is denied as moot. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/30/2018) (mro) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Mon 12/03 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Court to Request Counsel
Thu 11/01 7:40 AM
APPLICATION FOR COUNSEL. Document filed by Juan P. Chavez.(sc) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/29 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Jane Does 1-9, John Does 1-9, Scott M. Rudes. Document filed by Juan P. Chavez.(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/29 9:57 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Juan P. Chavez.(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 10/29 9:58 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |