Hawaii District Court
Judge:Leslie E Kobayashi
Referred: Barry M Kurren
Case #: 1:14-cv-00046
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 3:54 PM HST
Defendant
State of Hawaii, Department of Public Safety
Represented By
James Earl Halvorson
Department Of The Attorney General-State Of Hawaii
contact info
Bosko Petricevic
Department Of The Attorney General-State Of Hawaii
contact info
Brian James McCreanor
Department Of The Attorney General-State Of Hawaii
contact info
Defendant
Neal Watgatsuma
Represented By
James Earl Halvorson
Department Of The Attorney General-State Of Hawaii
contact info
Bosko Petricevic
Department Of The Attorney General-State Of Hawaii
contact info
Brian James McCreanor
Department Of The Attorney General-State Of Hawaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Carolyn C. Ritchie
Represented By
Margery S. Bronster
Bronster Hoshibata, Attorneys At Law, A Law Corporation
contact info
Andrew L. Pepper
Bronster Hoshibata, Attorneys At Law, A Law Corporation
contact info
Gregory Howard Meyers
contact info
Daniel G. Hempey
contact info
Anthony F. Quan, Jr.
Bronster Hoshibata
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2014
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 09/30/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
GPO Jan 28 2016
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT JUDGE FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE KURREN'S ORDER, DATED DECEMBER 8, 2015 [DKT. NO. 132] GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 136. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 01/28/2016. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Thursday, January 05, 2017
402 402 minutes Status Conference Thu 10:59 AM
EP: Conference held on 1/5/2017. (Court Reporter None) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]