Guerrero-Martinez v. Mayo Hotel, The et al
Oklahoma Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Claire V Eagan |
Referred: | Frank H Mccarthy |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00041 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 8:20 PM CST |
Plaintiff
Minerva Guerrero-Martinez
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC
Terminated: 03/28/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC
Terminated: 04/08/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Juan Prado
Terminated: 04/04/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 08, 2014 | ||
37 | 37 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Nettoyer (Dkt. # 36) is granted, and plaintiff's claims against defendant Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. This is a final order terminating this case. ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; terminating party Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC (a domestic limited liability company) ; granting36 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Documents Terminated:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (RGG, Chambers) | |
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number37 ) (srt, Dpty Clk) | ||
Friday, April 04, 2014 | ||
36 | 36 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT NETTOYER by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez (McHugh, Brendan) | |
35 | 35 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice of Defendant Prado (Dkt. # 34) is granted, and plaintiff's claims against defendant Juan Prado are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff shall forthwith file a fully-executed stipulation of dismissal or a motion to dismiss her claims against Nettoyer. ; terminating party Juan Prado (individually) ; granting34 Motion to Dismiss Party (RGG, Chambers) | |
34 | 34 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party prado and nettoyer by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez (McHugh, Brendan) | |
Friday, March 28, 2014 | ||
33 | 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC, dismissing all claims, by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez, Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (Deaton, Jo) | |
Thursday, March 20, 2014 | ||
32 | 32 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary granting the extension of deadline. The parties are directed to file their fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal no later than 3/28/14. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 3/28/2014); granting30 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) | |
Wednesday, March 19, 2014 | ||
31 | 31 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Cleary (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) | |
Tuesday, March 18, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 Third MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (Deaton, Jo) | |
Wednesday, March 12, 2014 | ||
29 | 29 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan granting the extension of deadline as requested. The parties are directed to file their fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal no later than 3/18/14. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 3/18/2014); granting28 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) Modified on 3/12/2014 to correct docket entry relationship(djh, Dpty Clk). | |
Tuesday, March 11, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 Second MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (Richardson, Denelda) | |
Wednesday, March 05, 2014 | ||
27 | 27 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The Court is in receipt of 26 Notice of Settlement regarding defendants Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC and J. Prado with plaintiff. The parties are directed to file their fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal no later than 3/19/14. , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 3/19/2014) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) | |
26 | 26 NOTICE of Settlement by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez (McHugh, Brendan) | |
Tuesday, March 04, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan granting the requested extension of deadline; the parties are directed to submit their fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal no later than 3/11/14. All other deadlines remain unchanged as to remaining defendants Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC and Juan Prado. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 3/11/2014); granting24 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) | |
24 | 24 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (Deaton, Jo) | |
23 | 23 ANSWER by Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC, Juan Prado (Sobel, David) | |
22 | 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC, Juan Prado (Sobel, David) | |
Wednesday, February 19, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC (Sobel, David) | |
Thursday, February 13, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) | |
Wednesday, February 12, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan -- The Court is in receipt of the parties' notice of settlement 18 regarding defendant Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC only. The parties are directed to submit their fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal no later than 3/4/14. All other deadlines remain unchanged as to remaining defendants Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC and Juan Prado. , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 3/4/2014), striking/withdrawing document(s) (Documents Terminated:14 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) | |
Tuesday, February 11, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez, Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (Deaton, Jo) | |
17 | 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David L Sobel on behalf of Nettoyer Cleaning Services, LLC, Juan Prado (Sobel, David) | |
Monday, February 03, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 3/5/2014) (RGG, Chambers) | |
15 | 15 ANSWER by Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (Deaton, Jo) | |
14 | 14 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (Deaton, Jo) | |
13 | 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) | |
Friday, January 31, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of non-objection by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez (McHugh, Brendan) | |
11 | 11 JURY DEMAND by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez (McHugh, Brendan) | |
10 | 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brendan Michael McHugh on behalf of Minerva Guerrero-Martinez (McHugh, Brendan) | |
9 | 9 ERRATA/CORRECTION by Mayo Hotel and Lofts MT LLC (With attachments) (Deaton, Jo) | |
Thursday, January 30, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Mayo Hotel, The be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/30/2014 to reflect correct event (sc, Dpty Clk). | |
7 | 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mayo Hotel, The to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) | |
6 | 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Denelda Richardson on behalf of Mayo Hotel, The (Richardson, Denelda) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Mayo Hotel, The (Deaton, Jo) | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jo Anne Deaton on behalf of Mayo Hotel, The (Deaton, Jo) | |
3 | 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Mayo Hotel, The (Deaton, Jo) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2013-5232 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1264159) by Mayo Hotel, The (Deaton, Jo) | |
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mayo Hotel, The (Deaton, Jo) | |
Thursday, November 14, 2013 | ||
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Minerva Guerrero-Martinez (sc, Dpty Clk) |