DANIELS v. C.R. BARD INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martini |
Referred: | Mark Falk |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-16045 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2019 6:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
BARD DAVOL, INC.
|
|
Defendant
C.R. BARD INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
SHELBY A. DANIELS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/07 7:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHELBY A. DANIELS. SHELBY A. DANIELS served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; BARD DAVOL, INC. served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019.(FARNOLO, NICHOLAS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 06/06 9:39 AM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:19-cv-02282, filed 05/31/2019. (dm ) |
||
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Thu 05/23 1:18 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of Ohio. (MDL 2846 CTO 30 Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.) (gh, ) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Thu 05/23 1:19 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of Ohio. (gh, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/13 5:15 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. BARD INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 11/13 5:15 PM
Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr) |
||
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/12 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against BARD DAVOL, INC., C.R. BARD INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9164900) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SHELBY A. DANIELS.(FARNOLO, NICHOLAS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Proposed |