Rusnak v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01442 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2019 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
C.R. Bard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Davol, Inc.
100 Sockanosset Crossroad
Cranston, RI 02920 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph E Rusnak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/12 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Chambers for Plaintiff Joseph E Rusnak (Chambers, Jason) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Thu 01/31 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Alonzo J. Holloway substituting for Terry Richardson and Brady Thomas as to Plaintiffs David Harrison, Lynn Harrison. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (Holloway, Alonzo) |
|
Monday, January 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 01/21 12:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc., filed by Joseph E Rusnak. (Vaughn, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/03 11:17 AM
Short Form ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Miner, Arryn) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 12/04 2:14 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 12/28/2018) by Plaintiff Dianna R. McClain. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (Morgan, Crystal) |
|
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/12 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6676188), filed by Joseph E Rusnak. (Vaughn, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |