Bank v. Simple Health Plans LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Margo K Brodie |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-06457 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2019 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Steven J. Dorfman
|
|
Defendant
Simple Health Plans LLC
|
|
Defendant
Simple Insurance Leads LLC
|
|
Defendant
Matthew E. Spiewak
|
|
Plaintiff
Todd C. Bank
119-40 Union Turnpike
Kew Garden, NY 11415 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 12/01 6:16 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (WV) |
||
Friday, February 04, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
4
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order(Other) Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 02/04 6:49 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court has reviewed the unopposed R&R and, finding no clear error, adopts28 Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione's R&R in its entirety pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Accordingly, the Court denies27 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Dorfman without prejudice, and grants Plaintiff leave to file a second amended complaint. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/4/2022. (Okonta, Patricia) |
|
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 12/21 3:37 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re27 MOTION for Default Judgment and other relief filed by Todd C. Bank. For the reasons set forth in this Report and Recommendation, it is respectfully recommended that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment be DENIED in its entirety. Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of this Report and Recommendation on the defaulting party at his last known address and file proof of service on the docket within three business days. Objections to the Report and Recommendation are due by 1/4/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/21/2021. (White, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 06/16 11:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The Court respectfully refers27 MOTION for Default Judgment to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for a report and recommendation. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/16/2021. (Bacchi, Joseph) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 06/14 1:09 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment and other relief by Todd C. Bank. (Bank, Todd) |
|
26 | 26
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 06/14 11:15 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Steven J. Dorfman has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Steven J. Dorfman is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) |
|
Wednesday, June 09, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Wed 06/09 7:56 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/04 10:04 AM
STATUS REPORT by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/04 1:35 PM
ORDER. There has been no appearance or answer filed by the remaining defendant, Steven J. Dorfman. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall request a Certificate of Default from the Clerk of Court no later than July 6, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/4/2021. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 06/01 6:06 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff shall electronically file a status report within 14 days of this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/1/2021. (DeSaro, Matthew) |
||
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/09 8:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd C. Bank re20 Amended Complaint,22 Summons Issued (Bank, Todd) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/09 9:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Amended Complaint as to Steven J. Dorfman. (Piper, Francine) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/06 4:24 PM
Proposed Summons. Re20 Amended Complaint by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/06 4:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven J. Dorfman, filed by Todd C. Bank. (Bank, Todd) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Strike Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 02/07 11:35 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court has reviewed the unopposed R&R and, finding no clear error, adopts the R&R in its entirety pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Accordingly, the Court denies Dorfman's motion to stay and Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against the Individual Defendants without prejudice, and grants Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/6/2020. (Valentin, Winnethka) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/13 7:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd C. Bank re17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re14 First MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 12/12 5:06 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re14 First MOTION for Default Judgment: For the reasons discussed in the attached R&R, this Court respectfully recommends that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Dorfman and Spiewak be DENIED without prejudice, and that Plaintiff be granted leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall immediately forward copies of this R&R to all Defendants and file proof of service with this Court. Parties have 14 days from service of this R&R to file objections. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/12/2019. (Huber, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 05/02 1:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:15 Letter MOTION to Strike13 Clerk's Entry of Default,14 First MOTION for Default Judgment. Defendant's motion is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for a report and recommendation. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/2/2019. (Beeney, Eliza) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 04/25 6:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 Letter MOTION to Strike13 Clerk's Entry of Default,14 First MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Todd C. Bank. (Bank, Todd) |
|
15 | 15
motion
DEACTIVATED EVENT - DO NOT USE
Thu 04/25 4:52 PM
Letter MOTION to Strike13 Clerk's Entry of Default,14 First MOTION for Default Judgment by Steven J. Dorfman. (Piper, Francine) (Piper, Francine) |
|
Att: 1 (4/25/2019) Document | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 04/11 10:38 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:14 First MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Todd C. Bank. Plaintiff's motion is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for a report and recommendation. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/11/2019. (Beeney, Eliza) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 04/10 6:32 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment by Todd C. Bank. (Bank, Todd) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 03/29 4:16 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Steven J. Dorfman, Matthew E. Spiewak has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Steven J. Dorfman, Matthew E. Spiewak is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Tue 03/26 4:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/26 4:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd C. Bank. Matthew E. Spiewak served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Bank, Todd) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/26 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd C. Bank. Steven J. Dorfman served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Bank, Todd) |
|
misc
Request for Certificate of Default - Denied
Tue 03/26 3:40 PM
REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time as it does not appear from the docket that the defendants were served yet and proposed clerk's certificate of default was not attached. re9 Request for Certificate of Default (Poveda, J.) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Fri 03/22 6:52 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 11/15 3:10 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 11/15 3:09 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 11/14 6:32 PM
NOTICE by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 11/14 2:54 PM
NOTICE by Simple Health Plans LLC, Simple Insurance Leads LLC of Receivership and Stay (Kessler, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Receivership Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of the paperless Order | ||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/15 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 11/13 4:22 PM
Proposed Summons. by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 11/13 4:21 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Todd C. Bank (Bank, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/13 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10932923 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -n,, filed by Todd C. Bank. (Bank, Todd) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/15 3:02 PM
Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |