Flores et al v. Victory Preparatory Academy et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond P Moore |
Referred: | S Kato Crews |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02916 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2019 2:33 AM MDT |
Defendant
Nancy (I) Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Victory Preparatory Academy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff (I) Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James (I) Seay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Seay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff (I) Reed
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Reed
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rosalie (I) Montano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rosalie Montano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron (I) Jajdelski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron Jajdelski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Camil (I) DeLaCruz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Camil DeLaCruz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Norma (I) Clinkinbeard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Norma Clinkinbeard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nancy Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary (I) Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel (I) Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B. F.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bertha Ceja
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Castaneda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
91 | 91
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 12/21 4:14 PM
ORDER Granting90 Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on December 21, 2020. (rvill, ) |
|
90 | 90
motion
Dismiss
Mon 12/21 1:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff M.F.. (Cron, Matthew) |
|
89 | 89
order
Minute Order
Mon 12/21 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte . On December 3, 2019, the parties filed a Joint Status Report85 stating that dismissal papers would quickly be submitted should the Probate Court approve M.F.'s settlement agreement and that the litigation would be resumed if the Probate Court did not approve the settlement agreement. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to file dismissal papers or updated status reports (or a joint status report) on or before January 19, 2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/21/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) |