United States of America v. Velasquez et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Case #: | 5:18-cr-00260 |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 15, 2018 1:13 AM CST |
Defendant
Joy Robison (28)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chad Burden (8)
|
|
Defendant
Edmundo Perez (19)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jimmy Pitts (12)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Artie Pope (10)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Skyla Pope (11)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew Pranger (39)
|
|
Defendant
Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez (30)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travis Richards (6)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ruth Robinson (13)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda Oney (16)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnny Ross (5)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chelsea Rouse (25)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Billy Rush (23)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Sanders (27)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justin Schneider (20)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua Stankewitz (18)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pedro Tamayo (29)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mariana Osuna Vega (31)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rogelio Velasquez (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Hood (21)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Manuel Campos (36)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luis Ernesto Chairez (33)
|
|
Defendant
Randall Crockett (7)
|
|
Defendant
Jessie Dalton (9)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga (3)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dillan Hager (4)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnathan Holly (15)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justin Hood (22)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brandy Norton (14)
|
|
Defendant
Rosario Mendoza Ibarra (2)
|
|
Defendant
Aundrea Nicole Little (26)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Irwin Edsel Mancilla (32)
|
|
Defendant
America Yasmin Montoya (38)
|
|
Defendant
Tatiana Sanchez Montoya (34)
|
|
Defendant
Mayte Esqueda Mora (37)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rikki Arin Mosley (35)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deserae Moyer (17)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carlos Neal (24)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/21/2021 11:50 PM CDT |
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 96 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Rogelio Velasquez (1), Rosario Mendoza Ibarra (2), Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga (3), Dillan Hager (4), Johnny Ross (5), Travis Richards (6), Randall Crockett (7), Chad Burden (8), Jessie Dalton (9), Artie Pope (10), Skyla Pope (11), Jimmy Pitts (12), Ruth Robinson (13), Brandy Norton (14), Johnathan Holly (15), Amanda Oney (16), Deserae Moyer (17), Joshua Stankewitz (18), Edmundo Perez (19), Justin Schneider (20), Paul Hood (21), Justin Hood (22), Billy Rush (23), Chelsea Rouse (24), Aundrea Nicole Little (25), Michael Sanders (26), Joy Robison (27), Pedro Tamayo (28), Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez (29), Mariana Osuna Vega (30), Irwin Edsel Mancilla (31), Luis Ernesto Chairez (32), Tatiana Sanchez Montoya (33), Rikki Arin Mosley (34), Manuel Campos (35), Mayte Esqueda Mora (36). (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - VELASQUEZ, | ||
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet 2 - IBARRA, | ||
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet 3 - ESCARSIGA, | ||
Att: 4 Criminal Cover Sheet 4 - HAGER, | ||
Att: 5 Criminal Cover Sheet 5 - ROSS, | ||
Att: 6 Criminal Cover Sheet 6 - RICHARDS, | ||
Att: 7 Criminal Cover Sheet 7 - CROCKETT, | ||
Att: 8 Criminal Cover Sheet 8 - BURDEN, | ||
Att: 9 Criminal Cover Sheet 9 - DALTON, | ||
Att: 10 Criminal Cover Sheet 10 - A. POPE, | ||
Att: 11 Criminal Cover Sheet 11 - S. POPE, | ||
Att: 12 Criminal Cover Sheet 12 - PITTS, | ||
Att: 13 Criminal Cover Sheet 13 - ROBINSON, | ||
Att: 14 Criminal Cover Sheet 14 - NORTON, | ||
Att: 15 Criminal Cover Sheet 15 - HOLLY, | ||
Att: 16 Criminal Cover Sheet 16 - ONEY, | ||
Att: 17 Criminal Cover Sheet 17 - MOYER, | ||
Att: 18 Criminal Cover Sheet 18 - STANKEWITZ, | ||
Att: 19 Criminal Cover Sheet 19 - PEREZ, | ||
Att: 20 Criminal Cover Sheet 20 - SCHNEIDER, | ||
Att: 21 Criminal Cover Sheet 21 - P. HOOD, | ||
Att: 22 Criminal Cover Sheet 22 - J. HOOD, | ||
Att: 23 Criminal Cover Sheet 23 - RUSH, | ||
Att: 24 Criminal Cover Sheet 24 - ROUSE, | ||
Att: 25 Criminal Cover Sheet 25 - LITTLE, | ||
Att: 26 Criminal Cover Sheet 26 - SANDERS, | ||
Att: 27 Criminal Cover Sheet 27 - ROBISON, | ||
Att: 28 Criminal Cover Sheet 28 - TAMAYO, | ||
Att: 29 Criminal Cover Sheet 29 - RAMIREZ, | ||
Att: 30 Criminal Cover Sheet 30 - VEGA, | ||
Att: 31 Criminal Cover Sheet 31 - MANCILLA, | ||
Att: 32 Criminal Cover Sheet 32 - CHAIREZ, | ||
Att: 33 Criminal Cover Sheet 33 - MONTOYA, | ||
Att: 34 Criminal Cover Sheet 34 - MOSLEY, | ||
Att: 35 Criminal Cover Sheet 35 - CAMPOS, | ||
Att: 36 Criminal Cover Sheet 36 - MORA | ||
38 | 38 MOTION to Seal Case by United States of America as to Rogelio Velasquez, Rosario Mendoza Ibarra, Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga, Dillan Hager, Johnny Ross, Travis Richards, Randall Crockett, Chad Burden, Jessie Dalton, Artie Pope, Skyla Pope, Jimmy Pitts, Ruth Robinson, Brandy Norton, Johnathan Holly, Amanda Oney, Deserae Moyer, Joshua Stankewitz, Edmundo Perez, Justin Schneider, Paul Hood, Justin Hood, Billy Rush, Chelsea Rouse, Aundrea Nicole Little, Michael Sanders, Joy Robison, Pedro Tamayo, Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez, Mariana Osuna Vega, Irwin Edsel Mancilla, Luis Ernesto Chairez, Tatiana Sanchez Montoya, Rikki Arin Mosley, Manuel Campos, Mayte Esqueda Mora. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
39 | 39 ORDER granting38 Motion to Seal Case as to Rogelio Velasquez (1), Rosario Mendoza Ibarra (2), Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga (3), Dillan Hager (4), Johnny Ross (5), Travis Richards (6), Randall Crockett (7), Chad Burden (8), Jessie Dalton (9), Artie Pope (10), Skyla Pope (11), Jimmy Pitts (12), Ruth Robinson (13), Brandy Norton (14), Johnathan Holly (15), Amanda Oney (16), Deserae Moyer (17), Joshua Stankewitz (18), Edmundo Perez (19), Justin Schneider (20), Paul Hood (21), Justin Hood (22), Billy Rush (23), Chelsea Rouse (24), Aundrea Nicole Little (25), Michael Sanders (26), Joy Robison (27), Pedro Tamayo (28), Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez (29), Mariana Osuna Vega (30), Irwin Edsel Mancilla (31), Luis Ernesto Chairez (32), Tatiana Sanchez Montoya (33), Rikki Arin Mosley (34), Manuel Campos (35), Mayte Esqueda Mora (36). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/10/2018. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
40 | 40 MOTION to Unseal Case by United States of America as to Rogelio Velasquez, Rosario Mendoza Ibarra, Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga, Dillan Hager, Johnny Ross, Travis Richards, Randall Crockett, Chad Burden, Jessie Dalton, Artie Pope, Skyla Pope, Jimmy Pitts, Ruth Robinson, Brandy Norton, Johnathan Holly, Amanda Oney, Deserae Moyer, Joshua Stankewitz, Edmundo Perez, Justin Schneider, Paul Hood, Justin Hood, Billy Rush, Chelsea Rouse, Aundrea Nicole Little, Michael Sanders, Joy Robison, Pedro Tamayo, Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez, Mariana Osuna Vega, Irwin Edsel Mancilla, Luis Ernesto Chairez, Tatiana Sanchez Montoya, Rikki Arin Mosley, Manuel Campos, Mayte Esqueda Mora. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
41 | 41 ORDER granting40 Motion to Unseal Case as to Rogelio Velasquez (1), Rosario Mendoza Ibarra (2), Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga (3), Dillan Hager (4), Johnny Ross (5), Travis Richards (6), Randall Crockett (7), Chad Burden (8), Jessie Dalton (9), Artie Pope (10), Skyla Pope (11), Ruth Robinson (13), Brandy Norton (14), Johnathan Holly (15), Amanda Oney (16), Joshua Stankewitz (18), Edmundo Perez (19), Justin Schneider (20), Paul Hood (21), Justin Hood (22), Billy Rush (23), Chelsea Rouse (24), Aundrea Nicole Little (25), Joy Robison (27), Pedro Tamayo (28), Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez (29), Mariana Osuna Vega (30), Irwin Edsel Mancilla (31), Luis Ernesto Chairez (32), Tatiana Sanchez Montoya (33), Rikki Arin Mosley (34), Manuel Campos (35), Mayte Esqueda Mora (36). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/11/2018. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
42 | 42 ORDER granting40 Motion to Unseal Case as to Jimmy Pitts (12), Deserae Moyer (17), Michael Sanders (26). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/11/2018. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
43 | 43 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Edmundo Perez. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
44 | 44 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell:Initial Appearance as to Edmundo Perez held on 9/13/2018, Detention Hearing waived as to Edmundo Perez on 9/13/2018, Preliminary Hearing waived as to Edmundo Perez on 9/13/2018. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USM. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
45 | 45 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Peter Scimeca as to Edmundo Perez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/13/2018. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
46 | 46 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Edmundo Perez. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
47 | 47 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Edmundo Perez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/13/2018. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
49 | 49 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Joshua Stankewitz. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
50 | 50 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell:Initial Appearance as to Joshua Stankewitz held on 9/14/2018, Detention Hearing waived as to Joshua Stankewitz on 9/14/2018. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USM. ( Preliminary Examination set for 9/18/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 201 before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell.) (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
51 | 51 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Angela Singleton as to Joshua Stankewitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/14/2018. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
52 | 52 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Joshua Stankewitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/14/2018. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
53 | 53 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joshua Stankewitz Preliminary Hearing set for 9/18/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 201 before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
54 | 54 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Angela Singleton appearing for Joshua Stankewitz (Singleton, Angela) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
Arrest of Manuel Campos in Northern District of Texas, Ft Worth. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | ||
55 | 55 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received from Northern District of Texas, Ft. Worth as to Manuel Campos. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
56 | 56 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry A Meyer, III appearing for Amanda Oney (Meyer, Henry) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
57 | 57 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott M Anderson appearing for Chelsea Rouse (Anderson, Scott) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
58 | 58 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell:Preliminary Hearing waived as to Joshua Stankewitz on 9/18/2018. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USM. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
59 | 59 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Joshua Stankewitz. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
60 | 60 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell:Initial Appearance as to Chelsea Rouse held on 9/18/2018. David McCrary appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared in the custody of the U.S. Marshal with retained counsel Scott Anderson; Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 9/25/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. As stated on the record Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending Preliminary and Detention Hearings. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
61 | 61 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Chelsea Rouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
62 | 62 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Chelsea Rouse. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for Tuesday, September 25, 2018 @ 11:00 A.M. before Judge Bernard M. Jones in Courtroom 101. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
63 | 63 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Sanders. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
64 | 64 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Michael Noland as to Michael Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
65 | 65 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell:Initial Appearance as to Michael Sanders held on 9/18/2018. David McCrary appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared in the custody of the U.S. Marshal with court appointed counsel Michael Noland. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 9/25/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. As stated on the record Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending Preliminary and Detention Hearings. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
66 | 66 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Michael Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
67 | 67 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joy Robison. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
68 | 68 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Christine Cave as to Joy Robison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2018. (dwl) (Main Document 68 replaced on 10/9/2018) (dwl). [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
69 | 69 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell:Initial Appearance as to Joy Robison held on 9/18/2018. David McCrary appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared in the custody of the U.S. Marshal with court appointed counsel Christine Cave. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 9/25/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. As stated on the record Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending Preliminary and Detention Hearings. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
70 | 70 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Joy Robison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
71 | 71 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Amanda Oney. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
72 | 72 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Henry Meyer as to Amanda Oney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
73 | 73 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell:Initial Appearance as to Amanda Oney held on 9/18/2018. David McCrary appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared in the custody of the U.S. Marshal with court appointed counsel Henry Meyer. Dft. waived Preliminary Hearing. As stated on the record Dft. was released on a $5,000.00 Unsecured bond per Conditions of Release. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
74 | 74 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Amanda Oney. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
75 | 75 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Amanda Oney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
76 | 76 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Amanda Oney in amount of $ $5,000.00. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
77 | 77 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christine M Cave appearing for Joy Robison (Cave, Christine) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
79 | 79 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Sanders. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for Tuesday, September 25, 2018 @ 10:00 A.M. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
80 | 80 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joy Robison. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for Tuesday, September 25, 2018 @ 10:00 A.M. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
81 | 81 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/11/18 in case as to Manuel Campos. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
82 | 82 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/11/18 in case as to Luis Ernesto Chairez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
83 | 83 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/11/18 in case as to Mayte Esqueda Mora. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
84 | 84 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/11/18 in case as to Irwin Edsel Mancilla. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
85 | 85 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/17/18 in case as to Michael Sanders. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
86 | 86 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/17/18 in case as to Joy Robison. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
87 | 87 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/18/18 in case as to Chelsea Rouse. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
88 | 88 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/18/18 in case as to Amanda Oney. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
89 | 89 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/13/18 in case as to Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
90 | 90 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/13/18 in case as to Rogelio Velasquez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
91 | 91 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/13/18 in case as to Mariana Osuna Vega. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
92 | 92 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/13/18 in case as to Pedro Tamayo. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
93 | 93 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/13/18 in case as to Rikki Arin Mosley. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
96 | 96 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/13/18 in case as to Edmundo Perez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
98 | 98 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter L Scimeca appearing for Edmundo Perez (Scimeca, Peter) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
99 | 99 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Richard C. Paugh. by Mariana Osuna Vega. (Paugh, Richard) Modified on 9/24/2018 (kr). [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
100 | 100 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael W Noland appearing for Michael Sanders (Noland, Michael) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
101 | 101 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/19/18 in case as to Randall Crockett. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
102 | 102 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/19/18 in case as to Chad Burden. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
103 | 103 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: M Michael Arnett appearing for Deserae Moyer (Arnett, M) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
107 | 107 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Initial Appearance as to Deserae Moyer held on 9/19/2018. David McCrary appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared in the custody of the U.S. Marshal with retained counsel Michael Arnett. Dft. waived Preliminary Hearing. As stated on the record Dft. is released on $5,000.00 Unsecured Bond per Conditions of Release. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
108 | 108 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Deserae Moyer. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
109 | 109 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Deserae Moyer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/19/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
110 | 110 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Deserae Moyer in amount of $ $5,000.00. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
111 | 111 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit from the District of Kansas by Mariana Osuna Vega. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
112 | 112 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Mariana Osuna Vega. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
113 | 113 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit from the District of Kansas by Rikki Arin Mosley. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
114 | 114 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Rikki Arin Mosley. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
115 | 115 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit from the District of Kansas by Rogelio Velasquez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
116 | 116 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Rogelio Velasquez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
117 | 117 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Johnathan Holly. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
118 | 118 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Justin Hood. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
119 | 119 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Aundrea Nicole Little. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
120 | 120 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Paul Hood. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
121 | 121 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Ruth Robinson. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
122 | 122 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Billy Rush. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
123 | 123 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Justin Schneider. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
124 | 124 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Jessie Dalton. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
125 | 125 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Dillan Hager. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
126 | 126 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Travis Richards. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
127 | 127 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Johnny Ross. (McCrary, David) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
128 | 128 ORDER granting117 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Johnathan Holly (15). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
129 | 129 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Johnathan Holly for 10/3/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
130 | 130 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Johnathan Holly Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
131 | 131 ORDER granting118 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Justin Hood (22). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
132 | 132 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Justin Hood for 10/3/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
133 | 133 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Justin Hood Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
134 | 134 ORDER granting119 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Aundrea Nicole Little (25). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
135 | 135 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Aundrea Nicole Little for 10/3/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
136 | 136 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Aundrea Nicole Little Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
137 | 137 ORDER granting120 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Paul Hood (21). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
138 | 138 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Paul Hood for 10/3/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
139 | 139 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Hood Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
140 | 140 ORDER granting121 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Ruth Robinson (13). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
141 | 141 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Ruth Robinson for 10/3/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
142 | 142 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Ruth Robinson Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
143 | 143 ORDER granting122 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Billy Rush (23). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
144 | 144 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Billy Rush for 10/3/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
145 | 145 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Billy Rush Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
146 | 146 ORDER granting123 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Justin Schneider (20). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
147 | 147 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Justin Schneider for 10/3/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
148 | 148 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Justin Schneider Initial Appearance set for 10/3/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
149 | 149 ORDER granting124 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Jessie Dalton (9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
150 | 150 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Jessie Dalton for 10/4/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
151 | 151 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jessie Dalton Initial Appearance set for 10/4/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
152 | 152 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: E Seth Hendrick appearing for Mayte Esqueda Mora (Hendrick, E) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
153 | 153 ORDER granting125 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Dillan Hager (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
154 | 154 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Dillan Hager for 10/4/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
155 | 155 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Dillan Hager Initial Appearance set for 10/4/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
156 | 156 ORDER granting126 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Travis Richards (6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
157 | 157 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Travis Richards for 10/4/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
158 | 158 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Travis Richards Initial Appearance set for 10/4/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
159 | 159 ORDER granting127 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Johnny Ross (5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/21/18. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
160 | 160 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Johnny Ross for 10/4/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
161 | 161 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Johnny Ross Initial Appearance set for 10/4/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
162 | 162 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Cyd Gilman. by Rikki Arin Mosley.(Gilman, Cyd) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
163 | 163 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Initial Appearance as to Mayte Esqueda Mora held on 9/21/2018. David Petermann appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared with retained counsel Seth Hendricks; USPO John Williamson. Dft. waived Preliminary Hearing. As stated on the record Dft. is released on previously posted Bond with Conditions of Release imposed by Northern District of Texas, Ft. Worth. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
164 | 164 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Mayte Esqueda Mora. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
165 | 165 AMENDED Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Jessie Dalton for 10/4/18 at 3:00 p.m. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
166 | 166 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit from the District of Kansas by Pedro Tamayo. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
167 | 167 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received from the District of Kansas (Wichita) as to Pedro Tamayo. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
168 | 168 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Rikki Arin Mosley. Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 9/28/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
169 | 169 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Michael Sanders held on 9/25/2018, Dft. waived Preliminary and Detention Hearings. As stated on the record Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
170 | 170 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Michael Sanders. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
171 | 171 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Michael Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/25/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
172 | 172 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to Joy Robison held on 9/25/2018. Dft. waived Preliminary Hearing. Govt. withdraws request for detention. As stated on the record Dft. is released on $5,000.00 Unsecured Bond with Conditions per Release Order. Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending execution of bond. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
173 | 173 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Joy Robison. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
174 | 174 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Joy Robison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/25/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
175 | 175 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Joy Robison in amount of $ $5,000.00. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
176 | 176 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Preliminary Examination as to Chelsea Rouse held on 9/25/2018. Dft. waived Preliminary Hearing. Govt. withdraws request for detention. As stated on the record Dft. is released on $5,000.00 Unsecured Bond with Conditions per Release Order. Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending execution of bond. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
177 | 177 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Chelsea Rouse. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
178 | 178 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Chelsea Rouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/25/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
179 | 179 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Chelsea Rouse in amount of $ $5,000.00. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
180 | 180 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Ernesto Chairez. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
181 | 181 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Rita Lyons as to dft Luis Ernesto Chairez. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
182 | 182 ORDER that Rita Lyons is appointed as interpreter for dft Luis Ernesto Chairez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/25/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
183 | 183 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Cesar Armenta as to Luis Ernesto Chairez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/25/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
185 | 185 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Initial Appearance as to Luis Ernesto Chairez held on 9/25/2018. David McCrary appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared in the custody of the U.S. Marshal with Count appointed counsel Cesar Armenta; Dft. waived Preliminary Hearing. As stated on the record Dft. is detained per Detention Order entered in USDC Central California. Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
186 | 186 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Luis Ernesto Chairez. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
187 | 187 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Craig Shultz. by Rogelio Velasquez.(Shultz, Craig) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
188 | 188 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit from the District of Kansas by Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
189 | 189 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received from the District of Kansas as to Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
190 | 190 2 pgs PETITION for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Joy Robison and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/29/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Memo and Consent | ||
192 | 192 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Initial Appearance as to Rikki Arin Mosley held on 9/28/2018. David Petermann appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared with court appointed counsel Cyd Gilman. Dft. waived Preliminary Hearing. As stated on the record Dft. is released on previously posted bond and conditions per Release Order from USDC Kansas Wichita. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
193 | 193 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Rikki Arin Mosley. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
413 | 413 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Cyd Gilman as to Rikki Arin Mosley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/28/2018. (dwl) | |
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
194 | 194 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph L Wells appearing for Travis Richards (Wells, Joseph) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
195 | 195 ORDER granting162 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cyd Gilman as to Rikki Arin Mosley (34). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/1/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
196 | 196 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cyd Gilman appearing for Rikki Arin Mosley (Gilman, Cyd) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
197 | 197 1 pgs PETITION for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Chelsea Rouse and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/2/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Memo | ||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
200 | 200 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Skyla Pope. Initial Appearance set for 10/11/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
201 | 201 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/3/18 in case as to Johnathan Holly. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
202 | 202 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/3/18 in case as to Billy Rush. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
203 | 203 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/3/18 in case as to Ruth Robinson. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
204 | 204 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/3/18 in case as to Justin Hood. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
205 | 205 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/3/18 in case as to Paul Hood. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
206 | 206 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/3/18 in case as to Aundrea Nicole Little. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
207 | 207 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/3/18 in case as to Justin Schneider. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
208 | 208 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit from the Central District of California by Irwin Edsel Mancilla. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
210 | 210 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Irwin Edsel Mancilla. (rmc) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
211 | 211 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Justin Hood. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
212 | 212 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Andre' Caldwell as to Justin Hood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/3/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
213 | 213 MINUTE ENTRY ~ for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones:Initial Appearance as to Justin Hood held on 10/3/2018. David McCrary appeared on behalf of the Govt; Dft. appeared in the custody of the U.S. Marshal with court appointed counsel Andre' Caldwell; USPO Candice Shane. Dft. waived Preliminary and Detention Hearing. As stated on the record Dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
214 | 214 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Justin Hood. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
215 | 215 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Justin Hood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/3/2018. (dwl) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
220 | 220 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ruth Robinson. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
221 | 221 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Joseph G. Shannonhouse, IV as to Ruth Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
222 | 222 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Ruth Robinson held on 10/3/2018. Preliminary Hearing as to Ruth Robinson waived on 10/3/2018. Detention Hearing as to Ruth Robinson waived on 10/3/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
223 | 223 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Ruth Robinson. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
224 | 224 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Ruth Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
225 | 225 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Johnathan Holly. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
226 | 226 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Lance B. Phillips as to Johnathan Holly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
229 | 229 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Johnathan Holly held on 10/3/2018. Preliminary Hearing as to Johnathan Holly waived on 10/3/2018. Detention Hearing as to Johnathan Holly waived on 10/3/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
230 | 230 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Johnathan Holly. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
231 | 231 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Johnathan Holly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
232 | 232 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Justin Schneider. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
233 | 233 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Craig M. Hoehns as to Justin Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
234 | 234 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Justin Schneider held on 10/3/2018. Detention Hearing as to Justin Schneider waived on 10/3/2018. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
235 | 235 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Justin Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
236 | 236 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Paul Hood. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
237 | 237 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Elliott C. Crawford as to Paul Hood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
238 | 238 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Paul Hood held on 10/3/2018. Detention Hearing as to Paul Hood waived on 10/3/2018. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
239 | 239 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Paul Hood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
240 | 240 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Billy Rush. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
241 | 241 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jason J. Murry as to Billy Rush. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
242 | 242 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Billy Rush held on 10/3/2018. Detention Hearing as to Billy Rush waived on 10/3/2018. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
243 | 243 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Billy Rush. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
244 | 244 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Aundrea Nicole Little. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
245 | 245 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Alyssa D. Farrell as to Aundrea Nicole Little. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
246 | 246 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Aundrea Nicole Little held on 10/3/2018. Preliminary Hearing as to Aundrea Nicole Little waived on 10/3/2018. Detention Hearing as to Aundrea Nicole Little waived on 10/3/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
247 | 247 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Aundrea Nicole Little. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
248 | 248 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Aundrea Nicole Little. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
249 | 249 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance re revocation of conditions of pretrial release as to Chelsea Rouse held on 10/3/2018. Bond Revocation Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Defendant temporarily detained pending bond revocation hearing; Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
250 | 250 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Chelsea Rouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/3/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
251 | 251 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Chelsea Rouse. Bond Revocation Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
252 | 252 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Justin Schneider. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
253 | 253 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Paul Hood. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
254 | 254 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Billy Rush. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
255 | 255 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Artie Pope. Initial Appearance set for 10/11/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
256 | 256 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Craig M Hoehns appearing for Justin Schneider (Hoehns, Craig) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
257 | 257 ENTER ORDER striking bond revocation hearing as to Chelsea Rouse, to be reset at a later date. Entered by direction of Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
259 | 259 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/4/2018 within the Western District of OK by Writ in case as to Dillan Hager. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
260 | 260 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/4/2018 within the Western District of OK by Writ in case as to Travis Richards. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
261 | 261 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/4/2018 within the Western District of OK by Writ in case as to Jessie Dalton. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
262 | 262 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 10/4/2018 within the Western District of OK by Writ in case as to Johnny Ross. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
263 | 263 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Johnny Ross. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
264 | 264 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Keegan K. Harroz as to Johnny Ross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
265 | 265 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Johnny Ross held on 10/4/2018. Detention Hearing as to Johnny Ross waived on 10/4/2018. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
266 | 266 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Johnny Ross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
267 | 267 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jessie Dalton. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
268 | 268 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Marna S. Franklin as to Jessie Dalton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
269 | 269 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Jessie Dalton held on 10/4/2018. Preliminary Hearing as to Jessie Dalton waived on 10/4/2018. Detention Hearing as to Jessie Dalton waived on 10/4/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
270 | 270 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jessie Dalton. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
271 | 271 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Jessie Dalton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
272 | 272 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Travis Richards. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
273 | 273 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Joseph L. Wells as to Travis Richards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
274 | 274 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Travis Richards held on 10/4/2018. Detention Hearing as to Travis Richards waived on 10/4/2018. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
275 | 275 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Travis Richards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
276 | 276 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dillan Hager. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
277 | 277 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jeffery D. Trevillion, Jr. as to Dillan Hager. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
278 | 278 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Dillan Hager held on 10/4/2018. Preliminary Hearing as to Dillan Hager waived on 10/4/2018. Detention Hearing as to Dillan Hager waived on 10/4/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
279 | 279 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Dillan Hager. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
280 | 280 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Dillan Hager. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/4/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
281 | 281 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Johnny Ross. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
282 | 282 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Travis Richards. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
283 | 283 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Marna Franklin. by Jessie Dalton. (Franklin, Marna) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
286 | 286 ORDER granting283 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Marna S Franklin withdrawn from case as to Jessie Dalton (9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/5/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
288 | 288 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Robert L. Wyatt, IV as to Jessie Dalton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/5/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
290 | 290 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Manuel Campos. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
291 | 291 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Perry Hudson as to Manuel Campos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/5/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
292 | 292 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Manuel Campos held on 10/5/2018. Preliminary hearing and detention hearing set for 10/11/18 at 11:00 AM. Defendant temporarily detained pending detention hearing; Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
293 | 293 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Manuel Campos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/5/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
294 | 294 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Manuel Campos. Detention Hearing set for 10/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
295 | 295 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Edward L. Robinson. by Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez.(Robinson, Edward) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
296 | 296 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Keegan K Harroz appearing for Johnny Ross (Harroz, Keegan) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
297 | 297 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received from the Central District of California as to Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
298 | 298 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Preliminary Hearing as to Manuel Campos waived on 10/11/2018. Detention Hearing as to Manuel Campos waived on 10/11/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
299 | 299 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Manuel Campos. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
300 | 300 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Manuel Campos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/11/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
301 | 301 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Skyla Pope. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
302 | 302 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Laura Deskin as to Skyla Pope. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/11/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
303 | 303 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Skyla Pope held on 10/11/2018. Detention Hearing as to Skyla Pope waived on 10/11/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
304 | 304 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Skyla Pope. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/11/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
305 | 305 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Skyla Pope. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
306 | 306 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Artie Pope. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
307 | 307 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL John Jensen as stand in counsel for 10/11/18 initial appearance as to Artie Pope. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/11/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
308 | 308 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Artie Pope held on 10/11/2018. Detention Hearing as to Artie Pope waived on 10/11/2018. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
309 | 309 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Artie Pope. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/11/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
310 | 310 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Artie Pope. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
313 | 313 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Anthony J. Hendricks as to Artie Pope. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/11/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
314 | 314 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Justin Hood on 10/3/2018 at Oklahoma County Jail. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
315 | 315 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Paul Hood on 10/3/2018 at Oklahoma County Jail. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
316 | 316 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Justin Schneider on 10/3/2018 at Oklahoma County Jail. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
317 | 317 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Johnathan Holly on 10/3/2018 at Oklahoma County Jail. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
318 | 318 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Aundrea Nicole Little on 10/3/2018 at Oklahoma County Jail. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
319 | 319 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Ruth Robinson on 10/3/2018 at Oklahoma County Jail. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
320 | 320 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Billy Rush on 10/3/2018 at Oklahoma County Jail. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
311 | 311 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason J Murry appearing for Billy Rush (Murry, Jason) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
312 | 312 FIRST MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jason J. Murry. by Billy Rush. (Murry, Jason) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
Docket Annotation: Disregard document321 filed in error. (cps) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | ||
321 | 321 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew E Henry appearing for Artie Pope (Henry, Andrew) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
323 | 323 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anthony J Hendricks appearing for Artie Pope (Hendricks, Anthony) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
324 | 324 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elliott C Crawford appearing for Paul Hood (Crawford, Elliott) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
325 | 325 ORDER granting312 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jason J Murry withdrawn from case as to Billy Rush (23). Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/16/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
326 | 326 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Michael G. McGuire as to Billy Rush. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/16/18. (lb) [5:18-mj-00456-P] | |
327 | 327 45 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Rogelio Velasquez (1) count(s) 1, 4, 6, 7, 9, 11, 13, 15, 17, 19, 21, 23, 25, 29, 31, 35, 36, 42, 44, 45, 52, Rosario Mendoza Ibarra (2) count(s) 1, Jorge Antonio Medina Escarsiga (3) count(s) 1, 44, Dillan Hager (4) count(s) 1, 6, 10, 12, 14, 18, 22, 24, 27, 30, 33, 34, 44, 46-51, Johnny Ross (5) count(s) 1, 8, 16, 20, 26, 31-32, 37-38, 43, 44, 52, Travis Richards (6) count(s) 1, 2, Randall Crockett (7) count(s) 1, 3, Chad Burden (8) count(s) 1, Jessie Dalton (9) count(s) 1, 5, Artie Pope (10) count(s) 1, Skyla Pope (11) count(s) 1, Jimmy Pitts (12) count(s) 1, 3, 44, 45, Ruth Robinson (13) count(s) 1, 3, Brandy Norton (14) count(s) 1, 3, Johnathan Holly (15) count(s) 1, 6, Amanda Oney (16) count(s) 1, 6, Deserae Moyer (17) count(s) 1, 6, Joshua Stankewitz (18) count(s) 1, 2, Edmundo Perez (19) count(s) 1, 10, 12, 14, 27, 44, 46-51, Justin Schneider (20) count(s) 1, 18, 22, 24, 27, Paul Hood (21) count(s) 1, 27, 28, Justin Hood (22) count(s) 1, 27, Billy Rush (23) count(s) 1, 8, 16, 20, 31-32, 38, 39, Carlos Neal (24) count(s) 1, 16, 37, Chelsea Rouse (25) count(s) 1, 26, 32, 37, 44, 52, Aundrea Nicole Little (26) count(s) 1, 30, 33, 34, 40, 41, Michael Sanders (27) count(s) 1, 4, 7, 19, 21, 44, Joy Robison (28) count(s) 1, 4, 7, 44, Pedro Tamayo (29) count(s) 1, 6, 9, 11, 13, 15, 17, 19, 21, 25, 29, 35, 36, Juan Enrique Serna Ramirez (30) count(s) 1, 23, 29, 36, 42, Mariana Osuna Vega (31) count(s) 1, 9, 11, 13, 15, 25, 36, Irwin Edsel Mancilla (32) count(s) 1, 44, Luis Ernesto Chairez (33) count(s) 1, Tatiana Sanchez Montoya (34) count(s) 1, Rikki Arin Mosley (35) count(s) 1, 31, Manuel Campos (36) count(s) 1, 35, Mayte Esqueda Mora (37) count(s) 1, 35, America Yasmin Montoya (38) count(s) 1, 7, 29, Andrew Pranger (39) count(s) 1, 44, 46-51 and Criminal Forfeiture (ac) (Attachment 24 replaced on 10/18/2018) (kr). | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 12 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 13 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 14 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 15 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 16 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 17 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 18 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 19 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 20 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 21 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 22 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 23 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 24 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 25 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 26 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 27 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 28 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 29 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 30 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 31 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 32 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 33 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 34 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 35 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 36 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 37 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 38 Criminal Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 39 Criminal Cover Sheet |