Cook v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Referred: | Steven E Rau |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-03184 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 14, 2019 4:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Cook
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/20 10:49 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/19/2019. (DLO) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Tue 03/19 12:57 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re15 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/19 12:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Edwin Cook. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 03/08 2:15 PM
(Text-only) ORDER in Response to13 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Plaintiff's March 8, 2019 letter, the pretrial scheduling conference set for March 13, 2019 is CANCELLED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 3/8/2019. (GFK) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/08 1:20 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Edwin Cook . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 03/01 11:52 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Edwin Cook.(Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Fri 01/25 2:33 PM
ORDER/NOTICE of Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/6/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau via telephone. See order for further instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 1/25/2019. (MME) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/14 1:31 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/14 1:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 11/29 12:53 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/29/2018. (AKL) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 11/29 11:23 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Thu 11/29 11:21 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6520905 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/29 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Fri 11/16 1:44 PM
ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/16/2018. (CLB) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/15 12:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MMP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 11/15 12:36 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-3184 (DSD/SER). (MMP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/15 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6495097) filed by Edwin Cook. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |