Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.6.7.195
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-06940 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 14, 2019 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.6.7.195
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Copyright
Mon 03/11 3:25 PM
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/08 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of John Doe Subscriber Assigned IP Address 24.6.7.195 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Tue 02/12 12:13 PM
ORDER as modified by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 11 Ex Parte Application FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON JOHN DOE DEFENDANT AND FOR ADJOURNMENT OF THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/12 12:14 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/23/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Ex Parte Application
Thu 02/07 4:42 PM
Ex Parte Application re10 Order on Ex Parte Application,6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, For Extension of Time Within Which To Effectuate Service On John Doe Defendant and For Adjournment Of The Initial Case Management Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Thu 12/20 9:27 AM
ORDER ON EX-PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/20/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Ex Parte Application
Tue 12/18 6:14 PM
Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 11/29 7:27 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Copyright
Mon 11/19 10:43 AM
REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 11/16 5:09 PM
Corrected Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 11/16 4:57 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 11/16 12:03 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 11/15 7:29 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 11/15 7:28 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/15 7:27 PM
COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.6.7.195 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12852404.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |