Flaherty v. Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn H Vratil |
Referred: | Gwynne E Birzer |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02627 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday May 19, 2019 5:19 AM CDT |
Defendant
Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Flaherty
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 03/14 11:21 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to 13 Stipulation of Dismissal.(hw) |
||
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/13 11:02 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Jeremy Flaherty. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 02/06 9:05 AM
ORDER. Upon review of11 Notice of Settlement, the Court notes this case has been resolved. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/19 at 10:00 am and all other pending deadlines are CANCELLED. Counsel shall submit the appropriate dismissal documents to the Court no later than 3/22/19. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/6/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/05 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Jeremy Flaherty (Stecklein, Alan) Incorrect event was used and modified the title of the document on 2/5/2019. (tvn) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/31 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Jeremy Flaherty. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling
Wed 12/19 11:54 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/19/18. (alm) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 12/14 2:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC identifying ARC Holdings, LLC as corporate parent (Porto, Anthony) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/14 2:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC.(Porto, Anthony) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 12/03 10:59 AM
DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Jeremy Flaherty. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer
Fri 11/30 2:22 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/14/2018 for Defendant Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 11/30/2018. (ca) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
State Court Records
Tue 11/20 4:24 PM
EXHIBIT A to1 Notice of Removal. (Porto, Anthony) Modified title on 11/20/2018. (kao) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Tue 11/20 4:24 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Porto, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 11/20 4:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC. (Porto, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 11/20 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2018-LM-005110 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4640601.), filed by Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC.(Porto, Anthony) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 11/20 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) |