North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: David S Cayer
Case #: 3:18-cv-00630
Nature of Suit423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2018
Terminated:Jun 16, 2020
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2019 7:42 PM EST
Counter Claimant
Misty McCoy
Represented By
Kristin Harmon Lang
Lang Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Robert K. Trobich
contact info
Counter Claimant
Robert McCoy, Jr.
Represented By
Robert K. Trobich
contact info
Counter Claimant
McCoy Motors, LLC
Represented By
Kristin Harmon Lang
Lang Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Robert K. Trobich
contact info
Counter Defendant
Ace Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By
James H. Henderson
contact info
Defendant
Misty McCoy
Represented By
Kristin Harmon Lang
Lang Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Robert K. Trobich
contact info
Defendant
Robert McCoy, Jr.
3606 Highway 51
Fort Mill, SC 29715
Represented By
Robert K. Trobich
contact info
Defendant
McCoy Motors, LLC
Represented By
Kristin Harmon Lang
Lang Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Robert K. Trobich
contact info
Defendant
Flash Autos, LLC
Represented By
Lex M. Erwin
Erwin, Bishop, Capitano & Moss, P.A.
contact info
David A. Luzum
Erwin, Bishop, Capitano & Moss, P.A.
contact info
Matthew Michael Holtgrewe
Erwin, Bishop, Capitano & Moss, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Robert McCoy, III
Represented By
Lex M. Erwin
Erwin, Bishop, Capitano & Moss, P.A.
contact info
David A. Luzum
Erwin, Bishop, Capitano & Moss, P.A.
contact info
Matthew Michael Holtgrewe
Erwin, Bishop, Capitano & Moss, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
McCoy Joint Revocable Trust
Represented By
Robert K. Trobich
contact info
Plaintiff
Ace Motor Acceptance Corporation
111 Cupped Oak Drive Suite F
Matthews, NC 28104
Represented By
James H. Henderson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
86 86 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Tue 06/16 1:42 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 84 Amended Motion to Remand Adversary Proceeding back to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 6/16/2020. (nvc)
Related: [-]