United States of America v. Thirty Two Thousand Seven Hundred Twenty Nine Dollars ($32,729.00) in U.S. Currency et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Marianne O Battani |
Referred: | Laurie J Michelson |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-10461 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 07, 2014 11:24 PM EST |
Claimant
James Gotshall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thirty Two Thousand Seven Hundred Twenty Nine Dollars ($32,729.00) in U.S. Currency
|
|
Defendant
Thirteen Thousand One Hundred Ninety Six Dollars and Fifty Cents ($13,196.50) in U.S. Currency from J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Savings Account #3039275387, titled to Gotshall Enterprises I
|
|
Defendant
Six Thousand Three Hundred Ninety Eight Dollars ($6,398.00) in U.S. Currency
|
|
Defendant
Real Property Located at 4145 Harvard, Detroit, Michigan
|
|
Defendant
Real Property Located at 4137 Harvard, Detroit, Michigan
|
|
Defendant
Real Property Located at 18831 Chandler Park Drive, Detroit, Michigan
|
|
Defendant
Real Property Located at 1015 Whittier Road, Grosse Pointe, Michigan
|
|
Defendant
One Hundred Forty Six Thousand Five Hundred Twenty Five Dollars ($146,525.00) in U.S. Currency
|
|
Defendant
Fourteen Thousand Two Hundred Twenty Dollars and Fifty Seven Cents ($14,220.57) in U.S. Currency from J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Checking Account #958159113, titled to Gotshall Enterprises
|
|
Defendant
Fifteen Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($15,500.00) in U.S. Currency from PNC Bank, Business Basic Checking Account #4261217652, titled to Harvard 4145, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Ninety Cents ($8,330.90) in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Business Advisor Checking Account #45201382239, titled to MZZX, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Eight Thousand One Hundred Ninety And Twenty Eight Cents ($8,190.28) in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Business Advisor Checking Account #4520137151, titled to CCSC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Assorted Silver Coins Valued at Two Thousand Two Hundred Ninety Five Dollars ($2,295.00) in U.S. Currency
|
|
Defendant
Assorted Silver Bars Valued At Four Thousand Forty Six Dollars and Fifty Cents ($4,046.50) in U.S. Currency
|
|
Defendant
$1,000.04 in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Circle Gold Checking Account #4522319168, titled to James Gotshall
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 05, 2014 | ||
44 | 44 Return of Service executed on 7/31/14 as to Thirty Two Thousand Seven Hundred Twenty Nine Dollars ($32,729.00) in U.S. Currency. (KKra) | |
Wednesday, July 16, 2014 | ||
43 | 43 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to One Hundred Forty Six Thousand Five Hundred Twenty Five Dollars ($146,525.00) in U.S. Currency. (DWor) | |
42 | 42 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to Fourteen Thousand Two Hundred Twenty Dollars and Fifty Seven Cents ($14,220.57) in U.S. Currency from J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Checking Account #958159113, titled to Gotshall Enterprises. (DWor) | |
41 | 41 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to Thirteen Thousand One Hundred Ninety Six Dollars and Fifty Cents ($13,196.50) in U.S. Currency from J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Savings Account #3039275387, titled to Gotshall Enterprises I. (DWor) | |
40 | 40 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to Six Thousand Three Hundred Ninety Eight Dollars ($6,398.00) in U.S. Currency. (DWor) | |
39 | 39 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Ninety Cents ($8,330.90) in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Business Advisor Checking Account #45201382239, titled to MZZX, LLC. (DWor) | |
38 | 38 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to Eight Thousand One Hundred Ninety And Twenty Eight Cents ($8,190.28) in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Business Advisor Checking Account #4520137151, titled to CCSC, LLC. (DWor) | |
37 | 37 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to $1,000.04 in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Circle Gold Checking Account #4522319168, titled to James Gotshall. (DWor) | |
36 | 36 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 as to Fifteen Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($15,500.00) in U.S. Currency from PNC Bank, Business Basic Checking Account #4261217652, titled to Harvard 4145, Inc.. (DWor) | |
35 | 35 Return of Service executed on 7/14/14 (DWor) | |
Tuesday, July 01, 2014 | ||
34 | 34 DECLARATION by GJON JUNCAJ re1 Complaint, OF PUBLICATION filed by United States of America (Juncaj, Gjon) | |
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
33 | 33 STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) | |
Wednesday, June 25, 2014 | ||
Minute Entry Scheduling Conference Cancelled - CASE SETTLED - Stipulated Consent Judgment to be submitted to the Court (KDoa) | ||
Tuesday, June 24, 2014 | ||
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2014 03:00 PM (TIME CHANGE) before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (KDoa) | ||
Wednesday, May 14, 2014 | ||
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 6/25/2014 03:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (BThe) | ||
Tuesday, April 29, 2014 | ||
32 | 32 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to Six Thousand Three Hundred Ninety Eight Dollars ($6,398.00) in U.S. Currency. (DWor) | |
31 | 31 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to $1,000.04 in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Circle Gold Checking Account #4522319168, titled to James Gotshall. (DWor) | |
30 | 30 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to Fifteen Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($15,500.00) in U.S. Currency from PNC Bank, Business Basic Checking Account #4261217652, titled to Harvard 4145, Inc.. (DWor) | |
29 | 29 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to One Hundred Forty Six Thousand Five Hundred Twenty Five Dollars ($146,525.00) in U.S. Currency. (DWor) | |
28 | 28 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to Fourteen Thousand Two Hundred Twenty Dollars and Fifty Seven Cents ($14,220.57) in U.S. Currency from J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Checking Account #958159113, titled to Gotshall Enterprises. (DWor) | |
27 | 27 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to Eight Thousand One Hundred Ninety And Twenty Eight Cents ($8,190.28) in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Business Advisor Checking Account #4520137151, titled to CCSC, LLC. (DWor) | |
26 | 26 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to Eight Thousand Three Hundred Thirty Dollars and Ninety Cents ($8,330.90) in U.S. Currency from Charter One Bank, Business Advisor Checking Account #45201382239, titled to MZZX, LLC. (DWor) | |
25 | 25 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to Thirteen Thousand One Hundred Ninety Six Dollars and Fifty Cents ($13,196.50) in U.S. Currency from J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Savings Account #3039275387, titled to Gotshall Enterprises I. (DWor) | |
24 | 24 Return of Service executed on 3/28/14 as to Thirty Two Thousand Seven Hundred Twenty Nine Dollars ($32,729.00) in U.S. Currency. (DWor) | |
Thursday, April 17, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2014 03:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (REFER TO IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (BThe) | |
Wednesday, April 02, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 WARRANT Returned Executed (DWor) | |
21 | 21 WARRANT Returned executed (DWor) | |
Monday, March 31, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 ANSWER to Complaint by James Gotshall. (Gleeson, Gerald) | |
Wednesday, March 12, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 CLAIM Forfeiture by James Gotshall. (Gleeson, Gerald) | |
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Claim regarding Asset ID No. 13-DEA-581258 dated June 12, 2013, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B. Claim regarding Asset ID No. 13-DEA-581271 dated June 12, 2013, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C. Claim regarding assets dated May 7, 2013 | ||
18 | 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald J. Gleeson, II appearing on behalf of James Gotshall (Gleeson, Gerald) | |
Thursday, February 06, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re1 Complaint, by All Plaintiffs (Juncaj, Gjon) | |
Tuesday, February 04, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
15 | 15 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
14 | 14 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
13 | 13 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
12 | 12 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
11 | 11 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
10 | 10 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
9 | 9 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
8 | 8 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
7 | 7 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
6 | 6 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
5 | 5 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
4 | 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
3 | 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
2 | 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DWor) | |
Friday, January 31, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: WAYNE. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Juncaj, Gjon) | |
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (KKra) |