Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc. et al v. Raffensperger et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-05391 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2019 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Seth Harp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State Election Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rebecca N. Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David J. Worley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brad Raffensperger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Care in Action, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fair Fight Action, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson
Terminated: 02/19/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Care in Action
Terminated: 02/19/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fair Fight Action
Terminated: 02/19/2019
|
Represented By
|
1. | Stacey Abrams Group Files Federal Suit Alleging Georgia Mismanaged Election (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 11/28/2018 | |