McCall v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-03256 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2019 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paulette McCall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 06/17 1:05 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/17/2019. (CBC) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Fri 06/14 9:53 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re17 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/14 9:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Paulette McCall. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Tue 05/07 2:14 PM
ORDER setting SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 6/27/2019. Confidential Letter to Court due by 7/1/2019. Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/7/2019. (JMK) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 05/06 10:34 AM
Minute Entry for telephone Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/6/2019. Counsel updated the Court on the progress of their settlement negotiations. (JMK) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/21 1:17 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/20/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 5/1/2019. Motions (disp) due by 10/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/21/2019. (JMK) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 02/21 11:10 AM
Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/21/2019. A written Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JMK) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 02/12 1:31 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Paulette McCall. Jointly Signed by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Operana, Brandon) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Fri 01/25 3:14 PM
ORDER Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/14/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/25/2019. (JMK) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/24 10:57 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/24 10:55 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/28 5:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/28/2018. (JGK) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 12/28 3:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 12/28 3:11 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6575258 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/28 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/28 3:47 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/27 3:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 11/27 3:37 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-3256 JNE/HB. (kt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/27 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6514934) filed by Paulette McCall. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |