Troyer et al v. Maxwell & Morgan PC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-04237 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2019 2:56 AM MST |
Defendant
Maxwell & Morgan PC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristen M Troyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard C Troyer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/24 1:20 PM
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. (Doc.28 .) For good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/24/2019. (REK) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 04/23 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice by Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer.(Bethell, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss with Prejudice | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 04/17 10:25 AM
ORDER granting25 Unopposed Motion to Continue Dismissal Deadline. The dismissal deadline is extended from 4/15/2019 to 4/22/2019, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this matter on 4/22/2019 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/16/2019. (MMO) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 04/15 6:53 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:25 MOTION to Continue Dismissal Deadline Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. (Bethell, Kristin) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Continue
Mon 04/15 6:47 PM
MOTION to Continue Dismissal Deadline by Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. (Bethell, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/13 3:09 PM
ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on 4/15/2019 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/13/2019. (MMO) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 03/12 7:44 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. (Bethell, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/27 4:43 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/26/2019. (REK) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/25 5:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maxwell & Morgan PC. (Campbell, Robert) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 02/25 4:18 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by Maxwell & Morgan PC.(Campbell, Robert) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 02/11 7:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maxwell & Morgan PC filed by Richard C Troyer, Kristen M Troyer.(Bethell, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 01/29 3:35 PM
ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 2/11/2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/29/2019. (MMO) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Fri 01/25 2:29 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Complaint by Maxwell & Morgan PC.(Campbell, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 01/15 9:45 AM
ORDER pursuant to15 Stipulation to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default: The Clerk's12 Entry of Default is hereby set aside. Maxwell & Morgan PC answer due 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/11/2019. (MMO) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/11 12:05 AM
STIPULATION re:12 Clerk's Entry of Default to Set Aside Default by Maxwell & Morgan PC.(Campbell, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Fri 01/11 6:58 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for R Travis Campbell on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Fri 01/04 7:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Travis Campbell on behalf of Maxwell & Morgan PC. (Campbell, Robert) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/28 9:04 PM
NOTICE re: Service by Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer . (Bethell, Kristin) |
|
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 12/28 9:55 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant Maxwell & Morgan PC. (LAD) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit
Thu 12/27 6:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Jack Piraino II by Plaintiffs Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. (Horne, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit
Thu 12/27 6:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Kristin Roebuck Bethell re:9 Application for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. (Horne, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Thu 12/27 6:15 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer against Maxwell & Morgan, P.C.. (Horne, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Thu 11/29 4:24 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/29/2018. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Wed 11/28 3:59 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Wed 11/28 3:58 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Wed 11/28 3:55 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/28 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Maxwell & Morgan PC. (BAR) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 11/28 3:51 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16243213. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-4237 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 11/28 3:45 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Kristen M Troyer, Richard C Troyer. (Horne, Thomas) (BAR) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/28 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16243213 filed by Richard C Troyer, Kristen M Troyer. (Horne, Thomas)(BAR) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |