United States of America v. 935 SW 7th Street, Newport, OR, Lincoln County, State and District of Oregon
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Anna J Brown |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-02057 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 18:981 Civil Forfeiture |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2019 1:32 AM PDT |
Claimant
Talon V. White
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
935 SW 7th Street, Newport, OR, Lincoln County, State and District of Oregon
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
order
1 - Scheduling
Wed 09/14 12:34 PM
Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has received counsels Motions to Withdraw [26, 27). The Court entered a final Judgment in this matter on December 20, 2019, and, therefore, lacks jurisdiction to address counsels Motions. (bb) |
||
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Withdraw
Fri 09/09 10:14 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record . Filed by Talon V. White. (Minns, Rain) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Withdraw/Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/09 9:18 AM
Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney . Filed by Talon V. White. (Boender, Bryan) |
|
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice
Fri 09/17 12:31 PM
Notice from U.S. Department of Justice. (joha) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Judgment - Terminate Case
Fri 12/20 2:06 PM
JUDGMENT: Government's Motion22 for Judgment of Forfeiture is GRANTED and JUDGMENT is entered as to the in rem Defendant. Signed on 12/20/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
oth_sup
Declaration
Thu 12/19 5:27 PM
Declaration of Amy E. Potter . Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Judgment of Forfeiture
Thu 12/19 5:26 PM
Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture . Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
21 | 21
oth_doc
Status Report
Thu 12/19 5:25 PM
Status Report by United States of America. Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
oth_ans
Withdrawal of Claim
Wed 11/27 1:56 PM
Withdrawal of Claim and Answer by Talon White . Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 10/11 9:10 AM
Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Further Joint Status Report is due by 12/19/2019. (slm) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
oth_doc
Joint Status Report
Thu 10/10 4:21 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Monday, September 02, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Address Change
Mon 09/02 5:29 PM
Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Talon V. White. (Boender, Bryan) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Stay
Fri 07/12 8:21 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the government's Unopposed Motion15 for Stay. This proceeding is STAYED pending resolution of the related criminal investigation. A Joint Status Report is due by 10/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stay
Thu 07/11 4:58 PM
Unopposed Motion for Stay . Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
oth_ans
Claim
Sun 06/02 12:19 PM
Verified Claim for Seized Property . Filed by Talon V. White. Answer is due by 6/24/2019. (Boender, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 05/10 1:56 PM
Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court DIRECTS Claimant Talon V. White to file a formal "Claim" as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule G(5)(a) no later than 6/3/2019 . The Court also DIRECTS the parties to file a Joint Status Report by 7/12/2019 . (slm) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
oth_evt
Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Fri 05/03 9:39 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Malcolm F. Marsh to Judge Anna J. Brown. (eo) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
7
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/05 4:10 PM
Answer to1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Talon V. White. (Boender, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
attyadm
Notification of New Pro Hac Vice or MDL CM/ECF Account
Tue 03/05 11:07 AM
Notification of CM/ECF Account for Rain Levy Minns ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rlminns . Go to[LINK:the CM/ECF login page] to set your password. (ecp) |
|
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Special Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/05 11:07 AM
ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rain Levy Minns for Talon V. White. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5758871 issued. Signed on 3/5/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/04 3:51 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rain Levy Minns . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5758871. Filed by All Defendants. (Boender, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
notice
Notice
Tue 02/05 4:47 PM
Notice of Publication of Civil Forfeiture Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment | ||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
service
Process Receipt and Return
Thu 01/10 3:16 PM
Process Receipt and Return of (Treasury) On December 6, 2018, a copy of the Complaint, Notice of Forfeiture, and Civil Case Assignment Order were posted in a conspicuous place on the defendant real property. Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
notice
Notice
Fri 11/30 1:06 PM
Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Writ of Entry
Fri 11/30 8:11 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Writ of Entry2 . Signed on 11/29/2018 by Judge Malcolm F. Marsh. (joha) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Wed 11/28 4:32 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Malcolm F. Marsh. (kf) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
motion
Writ of Entry
Wed 11/28 1:01 PM
Motion for Writ of Entry . Filed by United States of America. (Potter, Amy) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/28 10:23 AM
Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against 935 SW 7th Street, Newport, OR 97365. (Potter, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |