Brown v. Ramsay
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen M Williams |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-10279 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2019 5:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sheriff Richard A. Ramsay
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Thomas D. Lardin
Thomas D. Lardin, PA 370 W Camino Gardens Blvd Ste 336
Boca Raton, FL 33432 |
|
Plaintiff
Peter Sean Brown
|
Represented By
|
1. | He's a US citizen born in Philadelphia. He says ICE detained him anyway (cnn.com) |
Submitted Mon 12/03/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
223 | 223
order
Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion for Hearing
Mon 04/22 5:03 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion to Expedite Consideration of Pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (DE222 ) ("Motion"). In the Motion, Plaintiff requests a ruling on the motion, or in the alternative, a status conference or oral argument regarding the pending motions. Upon review of the Motion and the record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED . A hearing on the cross-motions for summary judgment (DE126 ; DE127 ) is SET for May 15, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Kathleen M. Williams in Room 11-3 of the Wilkie D. Ferguson, Jr. United States Courthouse, located at 400 North Miami Avenue in Miami, Florida. Plaintiff's First Motion to Expedite (DE 215 ) is DENIED AS MOOT . Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/22/2024. (ssh) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
222 | 222
motion
Expedite Hearing
Tue 04/16 7:30 PM
Second MOTION to Expedite Unopposed , MOTION for Hearing re154 Reply to Response to Motion,148 Response in Opposition to Motion,149 Response to Motion,127 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,152 Response/Reply (Other),126 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law by Peter Sean Brown. (Kacou, Amien) |