Informed Consent Action Network v. United States Food and Drug Administration
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie E Caproni |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-11237 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2019 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States Food and Drug Administration
5630 Fishers Lane Room 1035
Rockville, MD 20857 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Informed Consent Action Network
140 Broadway 46th Floor
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Sunday, February 10, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Sun 02/10 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) United States Food and Drug Administration. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Siri, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 01/07 10:42 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting7 Letter Motion to Stay re:7 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Rachael L. Doud dated January 3, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/3/2019) (ks) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 01/03 1:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on United States Food and Drug Administration. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
motion
Stay
Thu 01/03 11:09 AM
LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Rachael L. Doud dated January 3, 2019. Document filed by United States Food and Drug Administration.(Doud, Rachael) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/03 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachael Lightfoot Doud on behalf of United States Food and Drug Administration. (Doud, Rachael) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 12/19 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/19/2018) (ks) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/04 11:31 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Food and Drug Administration. (pne) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 12/04 11:28 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 12/04 11:29 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 12/04 11:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 12/03 5:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Food and Drug Administration, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 12/03 4:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Siri, Aaron) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/03 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against United States Food and Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-15995622)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron) |