Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-02719 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement (definitions) |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2019 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/22 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC [With Prejudice] (Bandlow, Lincoln)(acc) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 06/28 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/27 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Vondran on behalf of John Doe (Vondran, Steve)Attorney Steve Vondran added to party John Doe(pty:dft) (acc) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 04/30 3:59 PM
ORDER on11 Plaintiff's Second Ex-Parte Application for Extension of Time. Plaintiff will have until 6/29/2019 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/30/2019. (acc) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File
Tue 04/30 2:18 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Within Which To Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln)(acc) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, April 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Sat 04/27 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Lincoln Dee Bandlow (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Wed 03/06 10:44 AM
ORDER granting6 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference [Renewed]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (Dembin, Mitchell) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 03/05 2:48 PM
ORDER on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time Within Which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant. Plaintiff will have until 4/30/2019 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/5/2019. (acc) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File
Fri 03/01 5:19 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File For Extension of Time Within Which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 02/14 4:17 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference [Renewed] by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support | ||
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Mon 02/11 11:33 AM
ORDER denying4 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 2/11/19. (Dembin, Mitchell) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
motion
Discovery
Thu 12/06 6:29 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support | ||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/03 2:03 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 12/03 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (lrc) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/03 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11957843.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. The new case number is 3:18-cv-2719-AJB-MDD. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Bandlow, Lincoln)(lrc) [Copyright Report Mailed] (lrc). (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 (12/3/2018) Copyright Report |