Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-11351 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 03, 2019 5:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Mon 04/01 7:40 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 3/29/2019 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/29 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) John Doe. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 02/11 5:07 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. No conference on Friday. Service on defendant by 4/21/2019. Service due by 4/21/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/11/2019) (mml) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 02/08 6:55 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time within Which to Effectuate Service on Defendant and to Adjourn the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 15, 2019 addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jacqueline M. James. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 01/22 1:57 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting7 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTYSUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(t) CONFERENCE. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/22/2019) (mml) |
|
Saturday, January 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Sat 01/19 6:45 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:7 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
7 | 7
motion
Discovery
Sat 01/19 6:44 PM
MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 12/14 4:03 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/14/2018) (ks) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Thu 12/06 2:12 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj) |
|
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 12/06 11:33 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 12/06 2:07 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 12/06 2:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 12/06 2:09 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 12/05 5:24 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 12/05 5:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/05 5:22 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16006792)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A |