Beaufort, City of et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03327 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 16:1538 Endangered Species Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 09, 2019 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wilber Ross
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Marine Fisheries Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chris Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Western Geco LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Spectrum Geo Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
International Association of Geophysical Contractors
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
GX Technology Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
CGG Services (U.S.) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
American Petroleum Institute
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
State of South Carolina ex rel Alan Wilson, Attorney General
Attorney General P.O. Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Myrtle Beach, City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seabrook Island, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Port Royal, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pawleys Island, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mount Pleasant, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kiawah Island, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Island, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isle of Palms, City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hilton Head Island, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Folly Beach, City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edisto Beach, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charleston, City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Briarcliffe Acres, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bluffton, Town of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beaufort, City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Awendaw, Town of
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed over Trump plans for offshore drilling tests (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Tue 12/11/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Mon 10/05 3:55 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 36 (original filing - Letter) Reason: Filing user spread unnecessarily to (consolidated) Closed case Filing date of original filing: 10/5/2020 (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Entry Deletion
Thu 09/24 2:48 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 35 (notice of appearance) Reason: 35 should not have been (spread to)filed in this consolidated Closed case Filing date of original filing: 9/23/2020 (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Entry Deletion
Fri 05/29 11:24 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 34, 35 Reason: 34 should not have been (spread to)filed in this consolidated Closed case; 35 (Text Order) to be filed in lead case only Filing dates of original filings: 3/16/2020; 5/28/2020 (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/28 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristofor R Swanson on behalf of National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Wilber Ross Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Swanson, Kristofor) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/16 3:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re (362 in 2:18-cv-03326-RMG) MOTION for Entry of a Rule 502(d) Order Response filed by Awendaw, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Charleston, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Folly Beach, City of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, James Island, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/23/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Cunningham, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order
Thu 02/13 11:59 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 33 (Text Order) Reason: Refiled in lead case for reference only Filing date of original filing: 2/13/2020 (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Amici Curiae Brief | ||
32 | 32
misc
Entry Deletion
Tue 04/09 1:52 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 32 (Notice of Appearance), 33 (Motion), 34 (Text Order) Reason: Documents 32, 33 should not have been (spread to)filed in this consolidated Closed case; only file documents in lead case 2:18-cv-03326-RMG (per Order filed 12/28/18 only list in caption of document "Consolidated with 2:18-cv-3327-RMG") Clerk to refile documents in 2:18-cv-3326-RMG Document Numbers 250 (Notice of Appearance), 251 (Motion), 252 (Text Order) as of Filing date of original filing: 4/8/2019 for 250, 251 and 4/9/2019 for 252. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Intervene Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 02/08 3:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Town of Caswell Beach, Town of Oak Island, Town of Sunset Beach. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Allen, Christy) |
|
32 | 32
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Fri 02/08 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christy Ford Allen on behalf of Town of Oak Island, Town of Sunset Beach, Town of Caswell Beach Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Allen, Christy) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 01/16 11:05 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document (30 in 2:18-cv-03327-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Return . First attachment description: Bureau of Ocean Energy Mgt. Contingency Plan . Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Smith, James) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 01/16 10:04 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 30, 31, 32 Reason: Documents should not have been (spread to)filed in this consolidated Closed case; only file documents in lead case 2:18-cv-03326-RMG(per Order filed 12/28/18 only list in caption of document "Consolidated with 2:18-cv-3327-RMG") Filing dates of original filings: 1/16/2018, 1/18/2018. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 01/14 3:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the motion of Attorney Amelia Thompson to withdraw as counsel is granted. (Dkt. No. 27). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/14/2019.(ltap, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/09 10:34 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Awendaw, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Charleston, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Folly Beach, City of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, James Island, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce. Response to Motion due by 1/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thompson, Amelia) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 01/08 3:53 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re (60 in 2:18-cv-03326-RMG) MOTION to Stay re (59) MOTION to Intervene in Light of Lapse in Appropriations Response filed by State of South Carolina ex rel Alan Wilson, Attorney General.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/15/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Smith, James) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Intervene
Mon 01/07 1:00 PM
MOTION to Intervene by State of South Carolina ex rel Alan Wilson, Attorney General. Response to Motion due by 1/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Smith, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint in Intervention | ||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 01/04 5:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 Joint MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Awendaw, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Charleston, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Folly Beach, City of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, James Island, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/11/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Thompson, Amelia) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Fri 12/28 5:29 PM
ORDER granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:18-cv-03327-RMG. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings in these cases contain the case number:"2:18-cv-3326-RMG" and on the next line "(Consolidated with 2:18-cv-3327-RMG)"; it is FURTHER ORDERED that, as a result of this consolidation, case number 2: 18-cv-3327-RMG is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/28/2018. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03327-RMG, 2:18-cv-03326-RMG(rshu, ) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/28 5:11 PM
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/28/18.(hhil, ) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/28 5:10 PM
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/28/18.(hhil, ) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Thu 12/27 2:24 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Morgan ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8179891) by American Petroleum Institute, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc., International Association of Geophysical Contractors, Spectrum Geo Inc., TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company, Western Geco LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Thu 12/27 2:12 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Steen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8179834) by American Petroleum Institute, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc., International Association of Geophysical Contractors, Spectrum Geo Inc., TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company, Western Geco LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 12/21 4:19 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Western Geco LLC.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
15 | 15
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 12/21 4:19 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 12/21 4:17 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Spectrum Geo Inc..(Houseal, Sean) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 12/21 4:16 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by International Association of Geophysical Contractors.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 12/21 4:13 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by GX Technology Corporation.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
11 | 11
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 12/21 4:12 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CGG Services (U.S.) Inc..(Houseal, Sean) |
|
10 | 10
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Fri 12/21 4:11 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American Petroleum Institute.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Intervene
Fri 12/21 4:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Intervene by International Association of Geophysical Contractors, TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc., GX Technology Corporation, Spectrum Geo Inc., Western Geco LLC, American Petroleum Institute. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Houseal, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Answer, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Nikki C. Martin, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Peter Seidel, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Whitehead, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph R. Gagliardi, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Declaration of Richmond Miller, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit Declaration of Gary Poole, | ||
Att: 8 Affidavit Declaration of Erik G. Milito | ||
8 | 8
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 12/21 3:11 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Armstrong, Amy) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/20 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonelle M Dilley on behalf of National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilber Ross (Dilley, Jonelle) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/20 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Drake on behalf of National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilber Ross (Drake, Beth) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/20 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison C Finnegan on behalf of National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilber Ross (Finnegan, Alison) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 12/11 10:50 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jbry, ) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 12/11 10:48 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Awendaw, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Charleston, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Folly Beach, City of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, James Island, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce.(jbry, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/11 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8151518.), filed by Folly Beach, City of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Charleston, City of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Awendaw, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, James Island, Town of. Service due by 3/11/2019(jbry, ) |