Rogers v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-13348 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 09, 2019 3:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Mona Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/06 10:34 AM
MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS ORDERED that the cases from the call docket are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 05/03/2022. **See Rec. Doc 14175 filed in master case 16-md-2740**. (lw) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 01/15 8:58 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/11 5:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (mp) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 12/12 1:09 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/11 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7295073) filed by Mona Rogers.Attorney Curtis Brooks Cutter added to party Mona Rogers(pty:pla).(Cutter, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons |