Townsend v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Sullivan |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-02180 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2020 |
Defendant
Commissioner Social Security Administration
|
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Lee Townsend
|
GPO
Jun 23 2020
ORDER: Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 22 is GRANTED. Signed on 6/23/2020 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg) |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for EAJA Fees
Tue 06/23 12:13 PM
ORDER: Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA22 is GRANTED. Signed on 6/23/2020 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
oth_sup
Declaration
Thu 06/18 12:46 PM
Declaration of LANCE R.CLARK in Support of Motion for Attonrey Fees EAJA . Filed by Johnnie Lee Townsend. (Clark, Lance) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees -EAJA
Thu 06/18 12:44 PM
Stipulated Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA . Filed by Johnnie Lee Townsend. (Clark, Lance) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Document | ||
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Tue 05/19 2:43 PM
JUDGMENT: Based on the stipulation of the parties and on the terms set forth in the accompanying Order, this case is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed on 5/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Tue 05/19 2:39 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case be REVERSED and REMANDED for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed on 5/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Remand
Fri 05/15 2:03 PM
Stipulated Motion to Remand to Agency. Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Dmetruk, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/08 8:00 AM
ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time17 is GRANTED. Defendants brief is due by 6/15/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/07 1:37 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Dmetruk, Stephen) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
trial
Trial Brief
Mon 03/16 4:26 PM
Trial Brief . Filed by Johnnie Lee Townsend. (Clark, Lance) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Attorney Substitution
Wed 02/26 9:58 AM
Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Stephen Dmetruk is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Alexis L. Toma Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Dmetruk, Stephen) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
oth_doc
Administrative Record - Social Security
Fri 01/17 10:20 AM
Transcript of Social Security Administrative Record - Certification and Record of Service . Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. Plaintiffs brief is due by 3/17/2020. (Gowie, Renata) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 1, | ||
Att: 4 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 2, | ||
Att: 5 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 3, | ||
Att: 6 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 4, | ||
Att: 7 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 8 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 9 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 10 Disability Related Development Part 1, | ||
Att: 11 Disability Related Development Part 2, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 18 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 19 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 20 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 21 Medical Records Part 10, | ||
Att: 22 Medical Records Part 11, | ||
Att: 23 Medical Records Part 12, | ||
Att: 24 Medical Records Part 13, | ||
Att: 25 Medical Records Part 14, | ||
Att: 26 Medical Records Part 15, | ||
Att: 27 Medical Records Part 16, | ||
Att: 28 Medical Records Part 17, | ||
Att: 29 Medical Records Part 18, | ||
Att: 30 Medical Records Part 19, | ||
Att: 31 Medical Records Part 20 | ||
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Social Security Answer
Wed 01/15 6:25 AM
Answer to1 Social Security Complaint . Filed by Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Toma, Alexis) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 12/05 10:03 AM
Notice of Appearance of Alexis L. Toma appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Toma, Alexis) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons/Service Return (All Types)
Mon 09/30 8:36 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 9/25/2019. Service specifically made upon U.S. Attorney General. (ecp) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons/Service Return (All Types)
Mon 09/30 8:31 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 9/23/2019. Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (ecp) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons/Service Return (All Types)
Mon 09/30 8:22 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 9/17/2019, answer due on 1/15/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (ecp) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service Papers Received
Mon 09/16 3:00 PM
Service Papers Received. Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service. |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/09 3:19 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) |
|
6 | 6
service
Proposed Summons
Mon 09/09 1:42 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Lance) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Fri 12/28 10:25 AM
ORDER: Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis2 is GRANTED. Signed on 12/28/18 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
limited
Consent to Magistrate - by Party
Fri 12/21 10:28 AM
|
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
4 - Social Security Procedural Order FORM EVENT
Tue 12/18 2:28 PM
Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Tue 12/18 2:06 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Johnnie Lee Townsend. (Clark, Lance) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Tue 12/18 2:02 PM
Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner Social Security (In forma pauperis status selected) . Filed by Johnnie Lee Townsend against Nancy A Berryhill. (Clark, Lance) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |