John Does 1-7 v. Greg Abbott, et al
Original Case: 3:18-cv-00629
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cr-11620 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2019 10:00 PM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
GREG ABBOTT, Governor of the State of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STEVEN MCCRAW, Colonel, Director of the Texas Department of Public Safety
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREG ABBOTT, GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN DOES 1-7, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 16 2019
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [18-11620 Affirmed ] Judge: PRO , Judge: CH , Judge: GJC. Mandate issue date is 01/07/2020 [18-11620] |
Docket last updated: 12/16/2019 10:00 PM CST |
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant John Does 1-7 18-11620 (PAC) |