Linton et al v. Becerra et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-07653 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Jun 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2019 2:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
California Attorney General 455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94101 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Martin Horan, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert D. Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calguns Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Jay Linton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Madison Society Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul McKinley Stewart
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 21 2020
ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/21/2020. (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020) |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 03/22 6:08 PM
Proposed Order re76 Order re Summary Judgment by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, Kendall Jones, Chad Jay Linton, Madison Society Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Paul McKinley Stewart.(Lee, George) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 03/21 10:31 AM
STIPULATION re Dismissal of Defendant Robert D. Wilson filed by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, Kendall Jones, Chad Jay Linton, Madison Society Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Paul McKinley Stewart.(Lee, George) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
77 | 77
misc
Statement
Thu 03/21 10:28 AM
Statement of Fact of Death by Calguns Foundation, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, Kendall Jones, Chad Jay Linton, Madison Society Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Paul McKinley Stewart.(Lee, George) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service |