California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Case #: 5:18-cv-07650
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2019 3:15 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Santa Clara -California
Represented By
Anthony J LoPresti
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Elizabeth Gianna Pianca
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors
Represented By
Anthony J LoPresti
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Elizabeth Gianna Pianca
Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By
Alan Henderson Murphy
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc R. Bruner
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Laurence Robinson
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Jacob Edward Aronson
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Barbara J. Schussman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Marc Richard Bruner
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info


1. Silicon Valley Housing Crisis Ensnares Stanford (wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 04/15/2019
Docket last updated: 07/17/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 11, 2019
49 49 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 4:49 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCounty of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-] 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint' Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
48 48 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley H. Oliphant (Oliphant, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
47 47 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 1:56 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byBoard of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University. (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-] 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint' Memorandum of Points and Authorities
46 46 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian William Termyn (Termyn, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
45 45 misc Transcript Fri 8:46 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on April 17, 2019, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 5/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2019. (Columbini, Joan)
Related: [-] 36 Transcript Order, (s)36
Thursday, May 02, 2019
44 44 2 pgs misc Proposed Order Thu 3:28 PM
Proposed Order re42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint' Memorandum of Points and Authorities by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
43 43 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Thu 3:27 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint' Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCounty of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. Related [+] (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-] 42
42 42 motion Dismiss Thu 3:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint' Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 7/2/2019. Replies due by 7/11/2019. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
41 41 adr ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held Fri 9:44 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/25/2019 by Howard Herman (ec, COURT STAFF) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
40 40 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 1:06 PM
ORDER APPROVING 37 AMENDMENT TO STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/22/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
39 39 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference Mon 10:16 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, April 25, 2019, at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
37 37 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 5:58 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER -- AMENDMENT TO 30 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University. (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
36 36 misc Transcript Order Thu 12:24 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/17/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Robinson, Geoffrey) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 4/18/2019 (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
38 38 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 9:48 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 11:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 5/19/2022 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 10/28/2022, 10/31/2022 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 10/31/2022, 11/1/2022, 11/2/2022, 11/3/2022, 11/4/2022, 11/7/2022, 11/8/2022, 11/9/2022, 11/10/2022, 11/11/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/17/2019. (tshS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
35 35 audio Auto docketing digital audio upload Wed 2:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/17/2019 10:57:06 AM ]. File Size [ 8408 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:17:31 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
34 34 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Wed 2:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/17/2019. A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. FTR Time: 10:57 - 11:15. Plaintiff Attorney: Geoffrey Robinson via Telephone. Defendant Attorney: Anthony LoPresti, Elizabeth Pianca. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2019)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
33 33 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 3:20 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University. (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
32 32 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 12:01 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
31 31 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 8:38 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stanford University) (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
30 30 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 1:17 PM
ORDER APROVING 29 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
29 29 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 3:09 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULLE filed by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 10:17 AM
ORDER RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM APRIL 18, 2019 TO APRIL 17, 2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/13/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 4:13 PM
ORDER TERMINATING 21 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT; AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 2:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed byBoard of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University. (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 5:08 PM
ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS (granting 24 ). Any opposition due by 3/4/2019. Any reply due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/14/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11:01 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Deadlines to File First Amended Complaint or Opposition and Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University.(Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of G. Robinson,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, February 01, 2019
23 23 misc Proposed Order Fri 1:37 PM
Proposed Order re21 MOTION to Dismiss - Notice, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ,22 Request for Judicial Notice, by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 1:36 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re21 MOTION to Dismiss - Notice, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCounty of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. Related [+] (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 motion Dismiss Fri 1:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss - Notice, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 2/15/2019. Replies due by 2/22/2019. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 4:35 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES; AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CONSOLIDATE CASES ONCE THE LATER-FILED CASE HAS BEEN REASSIGNED (addressing 19 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
19 19 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 10:08 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES filed by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Edward Aronson (Aronson, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
17 17 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 8:39 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 1:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 10:13 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University. County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. Service on Santa Clara County Board of Supervisors (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 1:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University. County of Santa Clara -California served on 12/21/2018. Service on County of Santa Clara (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Gianna Pianca (Pianca, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11:35 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 12/26/18.(cfeS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, December 24, 2018
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 3:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 1:59 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors.. (LoPresti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/3/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to County of Santa Clara -California, County of Santa Clara Board of Supervisors. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 4:01 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Thu 2:54 PM
Proposed Summons. (Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Thu 2:33 PM
*** FILED IN ERROR,REFER TO DOCUMENT 5 *** Proposed Summons. (Robinson, Geoffrey) Modified on 12/20/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 1:54 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed byBoard of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University.(Robinson, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10:00 AM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed byBoard of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University. (Robinson, Geoffrey)($400 receipt # 0971-12944027) Modified on 12/20/2018 (haS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]