JITRADE INC. v. Wholesalefashionsquare.com, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-10654 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2019 1:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Wholesalefashionsquare.com, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
JITRADE Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 01/14 10:31 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been resolved by a Notice of Dismissal8 , hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Wed 01/09 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff JITRADE Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) or (c) as to All Defendants. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/28 11:40 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Wholesalefashionsquare.com, Inc. (iv) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Thu 12/27 3:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff JITRADE Inc.. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 12/27 2:34 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 12/27 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 12/26 6:33 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JITRADE INC., (Lee, Ginam) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 12/26 6:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JITRADE INC.. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 12/26 6:13 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22953394 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff JITRADE INC.. (Attorney Ginam Lee added to party JITRADE INC.(pty:pla))(Lee, Ginam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |