SPFPA and Participating Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Swanson Services LLC
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gershwin A Drain |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-14066 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 25, 2019 4:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Swanson Services LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
SPFPA and Participating Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Security Police Fire Professionals of America Retirement Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Eagle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gail Feustel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David L. Hickey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Les Kaciban
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick O'Quinn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Saye
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 10/10 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Clark, Matthew) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Appear*
Fri 09/27 9:43 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Motion Hearing or Status Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg) |
|
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Fri 09/27 9:31 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 9/30/2019 is Cancelled re11 Notice of Hearing on Motion (TMcg) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Hearing on Motion*
Wed 08/07 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 08/06 3:54 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/07 3:59 PM
ORDER Dismissing5 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 03/05 3:26 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Clerks Entry of Default*
Thu 02/28 9:19 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Swanson Services LLC* (DWor) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
petition
Request for Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 02/27 2:18 PM
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Document Continuation Default Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Service of Process, | ||
Att: 3 Document Continuation Proposed Default Entry | ||
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute*
Tue 02/26 9:04 AM
ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 3/5/2019 Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Tue 02/19 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Brooks, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/17 8:25 AM
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE/CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Swanson Services LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (DPer) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Thu 12/27 1:43 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Swanson Services LLC* (DWor) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Thu 12/27 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7044996 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Clark, Matthew) Modified on 12/27/2018 (DWor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Thu 12/27 1:44 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DWor) |
||
notice
Error
Thu 12/27 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Matthew Clark re1 Complaint. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor) |
||
misc
Addition of Parties
Thu 12/27 2:01 PM
Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Trustee Les Kaciban. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing1 Complaint,, (Clark, Matthew) |