Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 107.203.72.12
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01435 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 25, 2019 5:04 AM EDT |
defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 107.203.72.12
|
|
plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright
Wed 03/27 12:42 PM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ns) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 03/27 12:43 PM
Certified Copy of Voluntary Dismissal of Case8 , Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright9 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (ns) |
||
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Tue 03/26 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 01/09 10:53 AM
ORDER granting5 motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of a Motion
Tue 01/08 4:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Leave to File5 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Lansky, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Feiser | ||
5 | 5
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 01/08 4:53 PM
MOTION for leave to file by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright
Thu 12/27 2:21 PM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ns) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Thu 12/27 2:21 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/27 10:59 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/27 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 107.203.72.12 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 12/27/2018 (ns) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Thu 12/27 10:59 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4325184 (Bernier, Joel) |
||
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 12/27 2:23 PM
Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright4 , complaint1 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (ns) |
||
service
Summons Not Issued
Thu 12/27 2:26 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ; none provided (ns) |