Atari Interactive Inc v. Target Corporation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-10735 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 26, 2019 1:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atari Interactive Inc
Browne George Ross LLP 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 04/11 12:01 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing). Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
20 | 20
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 04/11 12:00 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 04/08 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive Inc. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Wesley, Keith) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 02/22 5:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Target Corporation, (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 02/22 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or To Transfer filed by Defendant Target Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or To Transfer, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Melissa Jungbauer, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/19 11:04 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE13 ,15 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Peter M. Routhier APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Target Corporation, designating Michael Jaeger as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 02/18 12:34 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter M. Routhier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Target Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/18/2019, Receipt No. 26FG9I8O) filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
misc
Errata
Mon 02/18 12:21 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Target Corporation. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter M. Routhier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Target Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23229614)13 (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 02/18 11:14 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter M. Routhier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Target Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23229614) filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 01/22 6:23 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive Inc, upon Defendant Target Corporation served on 1/3/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, etc. (Lauritsen, Eric) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 01/18 12:14 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Target Corporation answer now due 2/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Attorney Michael Jaeger added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft))(Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 01/02 7:59 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 12/28 2:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Target Corporation. (et) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 12/28 2:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 12/28 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Fri 12/28 1:34 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Atari Interactive Inc. (Wesley, Keith) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Fri 12/28 1:32 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Atari Interactive Inc. (Wesley, Keith) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/28 1:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Atari Interactive Inc. Atari Interactive Inc, (Wesley, Keith) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 12/28 1:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Atari Interactive Inc. Atari Interactive Inc. (Wesley, Keith) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 12/28 1:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Atari Interactive Inc. (Wesley, Keith) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 12/28 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22966319 - Fee: $400, filed by Atari Interactive Inc. Atari Interactive Inc. (Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Atari Interactive Inc(pty:pla))(Wesley, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |