MGA Entertainment, Inc. v. Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A., et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-10758 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 26, 2019 1:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
MGA Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Toymaker sues Louis Vuitton for the right to keep making pooey purses (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Fri 01/11/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 05/14 2:29 PM
STATEMENT OF DECISION GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) by Judge John F. Walter. Louis Vuitton's Motion to Dismiss MGA's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED without leave to amend; and All claims for relief against Louis Vuitton are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
47 | 47
order
Dismiss
Tue 05/14 2:24 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER, S.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [filed 4/19/2019; Docket No.37 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for May 20, 2019 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. After considering the moving, opposing, and reply papers, and the arguments therein, the Court rules as follows: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 05/08 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 37(Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 05/08 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of (Proposed) Statement of Decision Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 37(Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/06 3:46 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 37 filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 05/02 2:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/29 3:33 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 37 filed by Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 1:44 PM
ORDER DENIED RE: HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT38 by Judge John F. Walter. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Lodging
Tue 04/23 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING OF [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 37(Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
39 | 39
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 04/23 12:49 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss37 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) |
|
38 | 38
stip
Continue
Tue 04/23 11:29 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing from 05/20/2019 to 06/10/2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 37 filed by Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc..(Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
21
pgs
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Fri 04/19 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Statement
Mon 04/15 3:45 PM
STATEMENT JOINT MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER AND LOCAL RULE 7-3 filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 04/05 3:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc.(Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Redlined First Amended Complaint | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 04/04 5:21 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) |
|
33 | 33
order
~Util - Terminate Hearings Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Thu 04/04 5:15 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on April 8, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: October 7, 2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: October 11, 2019. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Wed 04/03 3:39 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 to 5 days, filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A... (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/01 3:23 PM
ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE DATE OF THE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING THE TIME TO FILE THE JOINT REPORT27 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Statement
Mon 04/01 3:22 PM
STATEMENT JOINT MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER AND LOCAL RULE 7-3 filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. re: Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only23 . (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/01 1:44 PM
DECLARATION of Robert E. Shapiro re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only23 DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 04/01 8:53 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Continue
Fri 03/29 6:07 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference from April 8, 2019 to June 3, 2019 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,24 filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A..(Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 03/29 4:29 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Change of Address or Firm's Name. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Appearance
Thu 03/28 5:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph A Lopez on behalf of Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney Joseph A Lopez added to party MGA Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lopez, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/27 2:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for April 8, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before April 3, 2019. (iv) |
|
23 | 23
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/27 2:41 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Tue 03/26 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-10758 JFW(RAOx). (rn) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/25 3:05 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas W. Laird APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.S., designating Mark A. Neubauer as local counsel is GRANTED.16 (vm) |
|
20 | 20
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/25 2:58 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Shapiro APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.S., designating Mark A. Neubauer as local counsel is GRANTED.13 (vm) |
|
19 | 19
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/25 2:53 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Non-Resident Attorney Joshua W. Mahoney APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.S., designating Mark A. Neubauer as local counsel is GRANTED.15 (vm) |
|
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/25 2:48 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Non-Resident Attorney Abigail J.M. Hoverman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.S., designating Mark A. Neubauer as local counsel is GRANTED.14 (vm) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Mon 03/25 12:50 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 03/22 9:45 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas W. Laird to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23422600) filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 03/22 9:41 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua W. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23422542) filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 03/22 9:36 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Abigail J. M. Hoverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23422469) filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 03/22 9:31 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23422311) filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/22 9:19 AM
NOTICE Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form
Mon 03/04 11:40 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/04 11:40 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court reviewed the parties stipulation extending time to answer the complaint. (Docket # 8.) The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),8 . (vm) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/01 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A., identifying LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton S.E.. (Neubauer, Mark) |
|
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 03/01 1:10 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. answer now due 4/5/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A..(Attorney Mark A Neubauer added to party Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A.(pty:dft))(Neubauer, Mark) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 01/18 9:35 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement (not to exceed 3 pages) plus proof of service of process by or before February 8, 2019. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/02 10:37 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Louis Vuitton Malletier, S.A. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Wed 01/02 10:28 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) |
|
Att: 1 CV11CC | ||
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 12/28 6:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/28 6:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc., (Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 12/28 6:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson, Benjamin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 12/28 6:41 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 12/28/2018, receipt number 26EDVCA8), filed by Plaintiff MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Attorney Benjamin C Johnson added to party MGA Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Johnson, Benjamin) |