Joseph John Heidelmaier v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00082 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
order
Attorney Fees
Tue 10/10 12:44 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting30 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Mon 10/09 5:03 PM
DECLARATION of Moselle C. Leland Bohorquez and Alexis M. Leland Motion For Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant To 42 U.S.C. 406b Third NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 30 filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Leland, Moselle) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 10/02 4:34 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUIRING MOSELLE C. LELAND AND ALEXIS M. LELAND TO FILE DECLARATION UNDER OATH by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, re: Third NOTICE OF MOTION for Attorney Fees 30 . The Court ORDERS Moselle C. Leland Bohorquez and Alexis M. Leland to file by October 9, 2023, a declaration under oath that attests to the accuracy and authenticity of each exhibit to the Motion, lays sufficient evidentiary foundation, and confirms each exhibit is a true and accurate copy of the information contained therein. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 09/15 4:44 PM
Third NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Leland, Moselle) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Supporting Motion For Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 24U.S.C. Section 406(b), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Awarding 406(b) Fees | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Attorney Fees
Tue 06/20 4:32 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING SECOND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: denying28 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees. The Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 04/11 1:48 PM
Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Leland, Moselle) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Supporting Motion For Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 406(b), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Awarding 406(b) Fees | ||
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
order
Attorney Fees
Wed 02/22 3:58 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. SECTION 406(b) (Dkt. No.24 .) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: denying24 MOTION for Attorney Fees. The Motion lacks admissible evidence that the estate of Judith S. Leland has the authority and right to the attorney's fees requested in the Motion. Further, the exhibits attached to the Motion lack authentication and are hearsay. Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (kh) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
transfer
Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form
Mon 01/30 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all proceedings in accordance with General Order 05-07. Case number will now read as 2:19-cv-00082-ADS. (ap) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 01/23 11:43 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier, re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 24 served on 1/23/2023. (Leland, Moselle) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 01/23 11:34 AM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Attorney Moselle Celia Leland added to party Joseph John Heidelmaier(pty:pla)) (Leland, Moselle) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Supporting Motion For Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 24U.S.C. Section 406(b), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Awarding 406(b) Fees | ||
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Fri 06/19 3:41 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES22 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Fees awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of $ $4,350.00. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees (es) |
|
22 | 22
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Fri 06/19 1:40 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $4350.00. filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier.(Leland, Judith) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Awarding EAJA Fees | ||
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 04/01 5:54 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is reversed and the case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the Memorandum Opinion and Order.20 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es) |
|
20 | 20
11
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/01 5:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. For these reasons, the Agency's decision is reversed and the action is remanded for further consideration consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order. (es) |
|
Saturday, October 05, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Sat 10/05 5:06 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul H Sachelari counsel for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Paul Sachelari is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Sachelari, Paul) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Sat 10/05 3:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina Naicker counsel for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Adding Tina Naicker as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Thu 09/12 10:13 AM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 08/01 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacy Wiesbrock counsel for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Stacy Wiesbrock is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 08/01 12:25 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul H Sachelari counsel for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Adding Paul Sachelari as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security Administration for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Paul H Sachelari added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Administrative Record (Social Security)
Thu 06/13 9:00 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (SOCIAL SECURITY) OF JOSEPH JOHN HEIDELMAIER (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 8 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 06/13 8:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/02 8:25 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING ESERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF JOSEPH JOHN HEIDELMAIER filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mj) (Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/21 9:58 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-82 PJW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 02/20 10:45 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Thu 01/31 1:16 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Leland, Judith) |
|
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Thu 01/31 1:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/31/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leland, Judith) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 01/11 3:44 PM
ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. (See document for details.) (sbou) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 01/04 4:11 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 01/04 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 01/04 2:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier, identifying Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Leland, Judith) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 01/04 2:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Leland, Judith) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Fri 01/04 2:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Leland, Judith) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 01/04 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22991422 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Joseph John Heidelmaier. (Attorney Judith S Leland added to party Joseph John Heidelmaier(pty:pla))(Leland, Judith) |