United States of America v. 0.04 Acres of Land, More or Less, et al
Texas Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando Rodriguez, Jr |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00004 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 28:1358 Land Condemnation |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2019 4:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
Cameron County
1100 East Monroe Street Dancy Building, Second Floor
Brownsville, TX 78520 |
|
Defendant
Berta Longoria Garcia
|
|
Defendant
0.04 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Cameron County, Texas
|
|
Defendant
Tony Yzaguirre, Jr
Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector P.O. Box 952
Brownsville, TX 78522 |
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/23/2019 11:26 PM CDT |
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 15 pgs Order to Sever Tracts RGV-HRL-4016 from 1:10CV186 and Orders that RGV-HRL-4016, identified and described in the Amended Declaration of Taking attached to this Order as Exhibit 1 be severed into 1:19-CV-4.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1) | |
2 | 2 Duplicate Entry for3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1) Modified on 1/7/2019 (dbenavides, 1). | |
3 | 3 2 pgs ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1) |