Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:19-cv-00039
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2019
Terminated:Mar 28, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Feb 21, 2019 2:53 AM CST
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory J Myers
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
John Joseph Michels, III
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Jack Tente
Represented By
Andrew C Walker
Curtis Walker Attorney At Law
contact info
Bennett Hartz
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, March 28, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 6:03 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/28/2019. (las)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 4:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jack Tente. Jointly Signed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hartz, Bennett)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10:03 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jack Tente. Jointly Signed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hartz, Bennett)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing Mon 3:41 PM
(Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2019 is CANCELLED. The parties report they have settled the matter and will file a stipulation of dismissal soon. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
8 8 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 5:20 PM
ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/19/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/23/2019. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
7 7 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 2:42 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Joseph Michels, III for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/17/2019. (NAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10:05 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
notice Notice - Judge Practice Pointers Thu 12:34 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
5 5 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 8:16 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-39 DWF/ECW. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
4 4 service Certificate of Service Mon 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John J. Michels III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6589761,1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Mon 2:51 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John J. Michels III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6589761 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 2:49 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian plc is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6589683) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. No summons requested. (Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A and B to State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet