Minnesota District Court
Judge:David S Doty
Referred: Hildy Bowbeer
Case #: 0:19-cv-00041
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2019
Terminated:Mar 13, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Feb 21, 2019 2:48 AM CST
Defendant
Flexan, LLC
Represented By
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Brittany Whitesell Biles
Stein Mitchell Beate & Missner LLP
contact info
Jonathan Eric Missner
Stein Mitchell Beato & Missner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Repco, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey J Bouslog
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Peter D Stiteler
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 13 2019
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/13/2019. (DLO)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 21, 2019
34 34 misc Letter Fri 10:48 AM
Receipt from Hennepin County re: Order of Remand. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
33 33 misc Letter Thu 1:27 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hennepin County District Court enclosing Order of Remand32 . (lmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
32 32 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Motion to Dismiss/General Wed 11:12 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying as moot12 Motion to Dismiss. (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/13/2019. (DLO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 11:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Jeffrey Bouslog and Peter Stiteler for plaintiff; Charles Nauen, Rachel Collins and Brittany Whitesell for defendant;Motion Hearing held on 3/8/2019 re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Repco, Inc.,12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flexan, LLC - argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. TIME IN COURT: 9 minutes. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (DLO)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
30 30 respm Reply Fri 4:56 PM
REPLY re12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flexan, LLC.(Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
29 29 respm Reply Memorandum or Notice of No Reply to Response to Motion Fri 4:19 PM
Reply to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Repco, Inc..(Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Friday, February 15, 2019
28 28 28 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 3:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Repco, Inc..(Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
27 27 misc LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Fri 3:53 PM
LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Flexan, LLC re25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Flexan, LLC.(Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 3:49 PM
DECLARATION of Charles N. Nauen in Opposition to10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Flexan, LLC.(Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-B
25 25 22 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Flexan, LLC.(Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
24 24 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 8:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brittany Whitesell Biles for Flexan, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/5/2019. (NAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Mon 10:41 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brittany Whitesell Biles. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6646610 filed by Flexan, LLC. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
22 22 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Fri 4:07 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re10 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 4:05 PM
Declaration of Jeffrey J. Bouslog in Support of10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Repco, Inc..(Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 9
20 20 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Repco, Inc..(Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
19 19 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Fri 1:09 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss12 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 1:07 PM
Declaration of Charles N. Nauen in Support of12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flexan, LLC.(Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
17 17 29 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 1:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flexan, LLC.(Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
16 16 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 9:25 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Eric Missner for Flexan, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/16/2019. (NAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
15 15 order Order/Notice to Attorney Tue 11:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to the pending Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 10) and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 12), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/15/2019. (JMK)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Tue 10:39 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan E. Missner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6606807 filed by Flexan, LLC. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION12 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss/General Mon 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Flexan, LLC. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION10 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Remand to State Court Mon 4:25 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Repco, Inc.. (Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order/Notice to Attorney Mon 2:32 PM
ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/14/2019. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Thu 4:27 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brittany Whitesell Biles. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6600198 filed by Flexan, LLC. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Thu 4:26 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan E. Missner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6600173 filed by Flexan, LLC. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 3:57 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Thu 12:32 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-41 DSD/HB. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D Stiteler on behalf of Repco, Inc.. (Stiteler, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Bouslog on behalf of Repco, Inc.. (Bouslog, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
2 2 service Certificate of Service Mon 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flexan, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,, (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-cv 18-17994 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6590606) filed by Flexan, LLC. No summons requested. (Nauen, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures,
Att: 3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Defendant's Notice of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 5 Joint Rule 26 Discovery Plan,
Att: 6 Notice of Filing of Notice of and Petition for Removal,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet