Minnesota District Court
Judge:Wilhelmina M Wright
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:19-cv-00044
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2019
Last checked: Friday Feb 22, 2019 3:05 AM CST
Defendant
Richard E.T. Smith
Represented By
Richard J Thomas
Burke & Thomas, Pllp
contact info
Chad J Hintz
Burke & Thomas, Pllp
contact info
Defendant
Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd
Represented By
Richard J Thomas
Burke & Thomas, Pllp
contact info
Chad J Hintz
Burke & Thomas, Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
James Briks
an individual 2861 State Highway 9
Breckenridge, MN 56520
Plaintiff
Jerome Briks
an individual 2861 State Highway 9
Breckenridge, MN 56520


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
40 40 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 3:37 PM
Declaration of Richard J. Thomas in Support of11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 18, 2019
39 39 service Certificate of Service Mon 5:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Briks, Jerome Briks re36 MOTION for Sanctions,37 Affidavit in Support of Motion,35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause,38 Response. (MMP)
Related: [-]
38 38 PPro_se Response Mon 5:32 PM
ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 12(b) and Rule 12(b)(1)(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
37 37 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 5:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of James Briks and Jerome Briks in SUPPORT OF36 MOTION for Sanctions filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
36 36 motion Sanctions Mon 5:27 PM
SANCTION REQUEST filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks. (MMP) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (MMP)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Show Cause Mon 5:25 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks. (MMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
34 34 service Certificate of Service Tue 3:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd re30 Notice of Hearing on Motion,32 Meet and Confer Statement,29 MOTION to Strike Pleading27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) ,33 Proposed Order to Judge - Other,31 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Hintz, Chad)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Tue 3:18 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re29 Motion to Strike Pleading. (Hintz, Chad)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Meet and Confer Statement Tue 3:14 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re29 Motion to Strike Pleading filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Hintz, Chad)
Related: [-]
31 31 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 3:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re29 MOTION to Strike Pleading27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Hintz, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
30 30 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION29 MOTION to Strike Pleading27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) : Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Hintz, Chad)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Strike Pleading Tue 3:07 PM
MOTION to Strike Pleading27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd. (Hintz, Chad)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Meet and Confer Statement Tue 2:46 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re11 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A and B,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 04, 2019
27 27 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 3:46 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks.(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
26 26 respm Reply Tue 12:35 PM
REPLY re11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 21, 2019
25 25 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 2:17 PM
Opposition To Defendant's re11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Pleading Thu 2:39 PM
ORDER striking21 Motion to Strike Pleading Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/21/2019. (JRG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11:44 AM
NOTICE filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks re: Amended Complaint(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
22 22 PPro_se Request Wed 11:40 AM
REQUEST FOR SANCTION filed by James and Jerome Briks.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
21 21 motion Strike Pleading Wed 11:37 AM
MOTION To Strik Defendant's Motion To Dismiss, and Answer To Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
20 20 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Tue 1:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing is rescheduled for for 4/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/19/2019. (VLM) cc: Briks. Modified text on 2/19/2019 (lmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
19 19 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Fri 1:57 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd .(Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
18 18 order Briefing Order Fri 11:13 AM
BRIEFING ORDER re:11 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs Respons due by 3/8/2019. Replies due by 3/22/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/15/2019. (VLM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
16 16 1 pgs order Order Referring All Motions to Magistrate Judge Tue 1:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Brisbois. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/12/2019. (RJE)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
15 15 service Certificate of Service Fri 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd re14 Proposed Order to Judge,12 Memorandum in Support of Motion,11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) ,13 Declaration in Support, (Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Fri 2:54 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 2:45 PM
Declaration of Richard J. Thomas in Support of11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3
12 12 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 2:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd.(Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
11 11 motion Dismiss/General Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 2:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/General , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction per FRCP 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd. (Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
9 9 service Certificate of Service Wed 1:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd re7 Notice of Appearance,8 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 1:38 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd. (Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Thomas on behalf of All Defendants. (Thomas, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 4:12 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/30/2019. (VLM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 9:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Briks, Jerome Briks. Richard E.T. Smith served on 1/20/2019, answer due 2/11/2019; Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (lmb)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 6:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Briks, Jerome Briks. Richard E.T. Smith served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019; Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (MMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
4 4 service Summons Issued - Non-Standard Mon 3:26 PM
Summons Re-issued as to Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd. (lmb) cc: Briks. Modified text on 1/14/2019 (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued - Non-Standard Tue 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd. (MMP) cc: Summons to both James Briks and Jerome Briks along with Information Sheet 2 regarding service. Modified text on 1/8/2019 (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 4:05 PM
MOTION FOR SCREENING OF THE COMPLAINT filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service by Mailing
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Richard E.T. Smith, Smith, Strege, Fredericksen, Butts, & Clark, Ltd (filing fee $400, receipt number 64641000158) filed by James Briks, Jerome Briks. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. cc: James Briks and Jerome Briks. (MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet